This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/17/2020 at 15:41:05 (UTC).

HIGDON, WALTER K VS CLOUGH, KEVIN T Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/24/2018 HIGDON, WALTER K filed an Other lawsuit against CLOUGH, KEVIN T. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MCHUGH, ANDREA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 NC

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MCHUGH, ANDREA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HIGDON, WALTER K

Defendants

CLOUGH, KEVIN T

CLOUGH, LISA ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FARROW, TIMOTHY MALCOLM

Defendant Attorney

VAZZANA, C

 

Court Documents

MOTION - FOR ENTITLEMENT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES PURSUANT TO PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

9/5/2019: MOTION - FOR ENTITLEMENT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES PURSUANT TO PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

ORDER OF DISMISSAL - ON MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE FOR FRAUD - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019118566)

8/28/2019: ORDER OF DISMISSAL - ON MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE FOR FRAUD - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019118566)

CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM C MARK VAZZANA, ESQUIRE

8/28/2019: CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM C MARK VAZZANA, ESQUIRE

EVIDENCE RECORD - #44215 - DEFENDANT

8/16/2019: EVIDENCE RECORD - #44215 - DEFENDANT

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

8/16/2019: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

NOTICE- OF MEDIATION AMENDED

8/2/2019: NOTICE- OF MEDIATION AMENDED

NOTICE - MEDIATION - THIRD AMENDED

7/24/2019: NOTICE - MEDIATION - THIRD AMENDED

NOTICE- OF MEDIATION AMENDED

7/24/2019: NOTICE- OF MEDIATION AMENDED

NOTICE - AMENDED OF MEDIATION COMPLIANCE

7/23/2019: NOTICE - AMENDED OF MEDIATION COMPLIANCE

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- KEVIN T CLOUGH - ISSUED 04/24/2018

4/24/2018: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- KEVIN T CLOUGH - ISSUED 04/24/2018

NOTICE- INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT LISA ANN CLOUGH

4/24/2018: NOTICE- INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT LISA ANN CLOUGH

NOTICE- INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT LISA ANN CLOUGH

4/24/2018: NOTICE- INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT LISA ANN CLOUGH

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION- TO DEFENDANT LISA ANN CLOUGH

4/24/2018: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION- TO DEFENDANT LISA ANN CLOUGH

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION- TO DEFENDANT KEVIN T CLOUGH

4/24/2018: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION- TO DEFENDANT KEVIN T CLOUGH

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

4/24/2018: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

COMPLAINT- AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

4/24/2018: COMPLAINT- AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

CIVIL COVER SHEET

4/24/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

4/24/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET

57 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - FOR ENTITLEMENT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES PURSUANT TO PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL - ON MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE FOR FRAUD - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019118566)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM C MARK VAZZANA, ESQUIRE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • HearingTime:01:30 PM; Location:COURTROOM 6C; Description:MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVIDENCE RECORD - #44215 - DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- OF MEDIATION AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - MEDIATION - THIRD AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- OF MEDIATION AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - AMENDED OF MEDIATION COMPLIANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- LISA ANN CLOUGH - ISSUED 04/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- KEVIN T CLOUGH - ISSUED 04/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT LISA ANN CLOUGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT LISA ANN CLOUGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION- TO DEFENDANT LISA ANN CLOUGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION- TO DEFENDANT KEVIN T CLOUGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT- AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less