This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 02/15/2021 at 18:31:20 (UTC).

HERLIHY, WILLIAM VS COMCAST CABLE COMMUNICATIONS LLC

Case Summary

On 01/22/2021 HERLIHY, WILLIAM filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against COMCAST CABLE COMMUNICATIONS LLC. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GALEN, PHYLLIS R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************9 NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GALEN, PHYLLIS R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERLIHY, WILLIAM

Defendant

COMCAST CABLE COMMUNICATIONS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOMEZ, CONRADO

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - COMCAST CABLE COMMUNICATIONS LLC

2/2/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - COMCAST CABLE COMMUNICATIONS LLC

CORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC - CONRADO COMEZ JR ESQUIRE

1/27/2021: CORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC - CONRADO COMEZ JR ESQUIRE

PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2021007239

1/26/2021: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2021007239

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - COMCAST CABLE COMMUNICATION LLC-NON SERVED

1/26/2021: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - COMCAST CABLE COMMUNICATION LLC-NON SERVED

EXHIBIT A

1/26/2021: EXHIBIT A

PAYMENT $300.00 RECEIPT #2021006300

1/22/2021: PAYMENT $300.00 RECEIPT #2021006300

COMPLAINT - COUNTY

1/22/2021: COMPLAINT - COUNTY

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/22/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2021
  • HearingTime:09:30 AM; Location:COURTROOM 2; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS ;Court Result:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - COMCAST CABLE COMMUNICATIONS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 03/02/2021 AT 9:30 AM IN 2 , JDG: GALEN, PHYLLIS R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC - CONRADO COMEZ JR ESQUIRE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2021007239

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - COMCAST CABLE COMMUNICATION LLC-NON SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$610.00; Amount Paid:$310.00; Waived Amount:$300.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $300.00 RECEIPT #2021006300

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Comcast Cable Communications, LLC is a litigant