This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 01/25/2022 at 02:55:18 (UTC).

HEFFERMAN, JENIFER Et Al VS HOMEOWNERS CHOICE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY INC

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 HEFFERMAN, JENIFER filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against HOMEOWNERS CHOICE PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY INC. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MCHUGH, ANDREA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 NC

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MCHUGH, ANDREA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SALVO, JAMES

HEFFERMAN, JENIFER

Defendant

HOMEOWNERS CHOICE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GONZALEZ, ROBERT

Defendant Attorney

SMITH, ANTHONEY

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/22/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

11/22/2021: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - HOMEOWNERS CHOICE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY INC - CO FLORIDA CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER AS RA - ISSUED 11/23/2021

11/22/2021: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - HOMEOWNERS CHOICE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY INC - CO FLORIDA CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER AS RA - ISSUED 11/23/2021

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

11/22/2021: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

NOTICE - SERVING INTERROGATORIES

11/22/2021: NOTICE - SERVING INTERROGATORIES

CERTIFICATE - OF SERVING FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/22/2021: CERTIFICATE - OF SERVING FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021099591

11/23/2021: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021099591

ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

11/29/2021: ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

SUMMONS SERVED - HOMEOWNERS CHOICE PRPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY INC

1/13/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - HOMEOWNERS CHOICE PRPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY INC

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL SERVICE

1/20/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2022
  • HearingTime:01:30 PM; Location:COURTROOM 7A; Description:CASE MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - HOMEOWNERS CHOICE PRPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 04/22/2022 AT 1:30 PM IN 7A , JDG: MCHUGH, ANDREA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$410.00; Amount Paid:$410.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021099591

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE - OF SERVING FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - HOMEOWNERS CHOICE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY INC - CO FLORIDA CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER AS RA - ISSUED 11/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Homeowners Choice Property and Casualty Insurance is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH, ANTHONY