This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/25/2023 at 01:10:19 (UTC).

HEALTHY TRAVEL STAFFING AGENCY LLC VS ADVINIACARE AT VENICE Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/15/2022 HEALTHY TRAVEL STAFFING AGENCY LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ADVINIACARE AT VENICE. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARROLL, HUNTER W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 NC

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARROLL, HUNTER W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HEALTHY TRAVEL STAFFING AGENCY LLC

Defendant

VENICE REHAB CENTER LLC D/B/A ADVINIACARE AT VENICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RINALDI, THOMAS

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/15/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

9/15/2022: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - VENICE REHAB CENTER LLC

9/15/2022: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - VENICE REHAB CENTER LLC

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022083919

9/15/2022: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022083919

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE

9/20/2022: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE

PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2022086014

9/21/2022: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2022086014

ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

9/22/2022: ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

CERTIFICATE - COMPLIANCE

10/6/2022: CERTIFICATE - COMPLIANCE

NOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

10/13/2022: NOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - VENICE REHAB CENTER LLC DBA ADVINIACARE AT VENICE

10/13/2022: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - VENICE REHAB CENTER LLC DBA ADVINIACARE AT VENICE

SUMMONS SERVED - VENICE REHAB CENTER LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA ADVINIACARE AT VENICE

10/20/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - VENICE REHAB CENTER LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA ADVINIACARE AT VENICE

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - VENICE REHAB CENTER LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA ADVINIACARE AT VENICE

10/20/2022: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - VENICE REHAB CENTER LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA ADVINIACARE AT VENICE

DEFAULT - VENICE REHAB CENTER LLC D/B/A ADVINIACARE AT VENICE

10/21/2022: DEFAULT - VENICE REHAB CENTER LLC D/B/A ADVINIACARE AT VENICE

MOTION - TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT

1/17/2023: MOTION - TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT

ORDER - OF REFERRAL TO CIVIL MAGISTRATE

1/20/2023: ORDER - OF REFERRAL TO CIVIL MAGISTRATE

CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC

1/20/2023: CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

1/23/2023: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2023
  • HearingTime: 02:30 PM; Location: COURTROOM 6C; Description: CASE MANAGEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OF REFERRAL TO CIVIL MAGISTRATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT - VENICE REHAB CENTER LLC D/B/A ADVINIACARE AT VENICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - VENICE REHAB CENTER LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA ADVINIACARE AT VENICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - VENICE REHAB CENTER LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA ADVINIACARE AT VENICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketACTION: CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE DEFAULT - NAME ON PROOF OF SERVICE DOES NOT MATCH - VENICE REHAB CENTER LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - VENICE REHAB CENTER LLC DBA ADVINIACARE AT VENICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2022086014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - VENICE REHAB CENTER LLC DBA ADVINIACARE AT VENICE - ISSUED 9/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $420.00; Amount Paid: $420.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT; Total Fee: $400.00; Amount Paid: $400.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022083919

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED - UNABLE TO ISSUE - DEFENDANT'S NAME DOES NOT MATCH COMPLAINT - VENICE REHAB CENTER LLC DBA ADVINIACARE AT VENICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less