This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 10/19/2020 at 18:31:58 (UTC).

HAYNES, ROBERT VS JOPPICH, DEREK A Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 HAYNES, ROBERT filed an Other lawsuit against JOPPICH, DEREK A. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WALKER, STEPHEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7 NC

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WALKER, STEPHEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HAYNES, ROBERT

Defendants

JOPPICH, DEREK A

N&M COOLING AND HEATING INC

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS SERVED- DEREK A JOPPICH

10/12/2020: SUMMONS SERVED- DEREK A JOPPICH

SUMMONS SERVED- N & M COOLING & HEATING

10/6/2020: SUMMONS SERVED- N & M COOLING & HEATING

PAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2020076562

9/29/2020: PAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2020076562

NOTICE - AMENDED - SERVING INTERROGATORIES

9/28/2020: NOTICE - AMENDED - SERVING INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE - AMENDED - SERVING INTERROGATORIES

9/28/2020: NOTICE - AMENDED - SERVING INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - AMENDED

9/28/2020: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - AMENDED

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - AMENDED

9/28/2020: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - AMENDED

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS - AMENDED

9/28/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS - AMENDED

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS - AMENDED

9/28/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS - AMENDED

NOTICE- OF INTERROGATORIES

9/25/2020: NOTICE- OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

9/25/2020: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

9/25/2020: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

9/25/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

9/25/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- N & M COOLING AND HEATING INC - ISSUED 9/25/20

9/25/2020: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- N & M COOLING AND HEATING INC - ISSUED 9/25/20

SUMMONS- PROPOSED- CLERK NOT ABLE TO ISSUE DOES NOT MATCH CASE STYLE DEREK A JOSEPH

9/25/2020: SUMMONS- PROPOSED- CLERK NOT ABLE TO ISSUE DOES NOT MATCH CASE STYLE DEREK A JOSEPH

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/25/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/25/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED- DEREK A JOPPICH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED- N & M COOLING & HEATING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2020076562

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - AMENDED - SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - AMENDED - SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS - AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS - AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- N & M COOLING AND HEATING INC - ISSUED 9/25/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED- CLERK NOT ABLE TO ISSUE DOES NOT MATCH CASE STYLE DEREK A JOSEPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less