This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/20/2022 at 20:37:37 (UTC).

HARTMAN, ERIC S Et Al VS FEDNAT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/01/2021 HARTMAN, ERIC S filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against FEDNAT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MCHUGH, ANDREA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 NC

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MCHUGH, ANDREA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HARTMAN, SANDRA R

HARTMAN, ERIC S

Defendant

FEDNAT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEVY, HAROLD

Defendant Attorney

FAKHOURY, JAMES

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

2/1/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT- FOR DAMAGES

2/1/2021: COMPLAINT- FOR DAMAGES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

2/1/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF FILING- REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

2/1/2021: NOTICE OF FILING- REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

NOTICE- OF INTERROGATORIES

2/1/2021: NOTICE- OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

2/1/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- FEDNAT INSURANCE COMPANY - SUMMON ISSUED 2/2/21

2/1/2021: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- FEDNAT INSURANCE COMPANY - SUMMON ISSUED 2/2/21

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021008776

2/1/2021: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021008776

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DISCLOSUE, AND DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES

2/12/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DISCLOSUE, AND DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES

MOTION - EXTENSION OF TIME

3/3/2021: MOTION - EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE - OF SETTLEMENT AND REQUEST FOR REMOVAL FROM HEARING DOCKET

5/21/2021: NOTICE - OF SETTLEMENT AND REQUEST FOR REMOVAL FROM HEARING DOCKET

ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE FILE

8/19/2021: ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE FILE

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

8/23/2021: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE FILE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OF SETTLEMENT AND REQUEST FOR REMOVAL FROM HEARING DOCKET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - EXTENSION OF TIME

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DISCLOSUE, AND DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$410.00; Amount Paid:$410.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021008776

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- FEDNAT INSURANCE COMPANY - SUMMON ISSUED 2/2/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING- REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT- FOR DAMAGES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FEDNAT Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FAKHOURY , JAMES E.