This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/03/2022 at 18:31:10 (UTC).

HANNA, WILLIAM VS FRESH EXPRESS INCORPORATED Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/10/2022 HANNA, WILLIAM filed an Other lawsuit against FRESH EXPRESS INCORPORATED. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MCHUGH, ANDREA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 NC

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MCHUGH, ANDREA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HANNA, WILLIAM

Defendants

FRESH EXPRESS INCORPORATED

PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALAIMO, MARIA

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

5/10/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

5/10/2022: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS INC

5/10/2022: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS INC

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- FRESHH EXPRESS INCORPORATED

5/10/2022: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- FRESHH EXPRESS INCORPORATED

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

5/10/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

5/10/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE- OF INTERROGATORIES

5/10/2022: NOTICE- OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE- OF INTERROGATORIES

5/10/2022: NOTICE- OF INTERROGATORIES

ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

5/10/2022: ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2022042132

5/10/2022: PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2022042132

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2022
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 6C; Description:CASE MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$420.00; Amount Paid:$420.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2022042132

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 10/28/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN 6C , JDG: MCHUGH, ANDREA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- FRESH EXPRESS INCORPORATED - ISSUED 5/12/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS INC - ISSUED 5/12/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fresh Express Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Publix Super Markets Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARIA R ALAIMO