This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/02/2021 at 10:55:56 (UTC).

HALPERN, EUGENE Et Al VS THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/08/2014 HALPERN, EUGENE filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURLEY, ROCHELLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 NC

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURLEY, ROCHELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HALPERN, TOBY

HALPERN, EUGENE

Defendant

THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

EASTMOORE, THEODORE

PRESTON, DAVID

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2015060515)

5/18/2015: STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2015060515)

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

3/4/2015: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES

3/4/2015: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES

SUBPOENA RETURNED - SERVED - SARASOTA COUTNY EMS

2/26/2015: SUBPOENA RETURNED - SERVED - SARASOTA COUTNY EMS

NOTICE - OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUESTS FOR COPIES

2/9/2015: NOTICE - OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUESTS FOR COPIES

PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COPIES

2/9/2015: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COPIES

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY

2/9/2015: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY

THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY'S SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

1/23/2015: THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY'S SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES

1/6/2015: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF CONSORTIUM INTERROGATORIES

8/28/2014: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF CONSORTIUM INTERROGATORIES

THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

8/28/2014: THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

NOTICE-APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

8/28/2014: NOTICE-APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS SERVED - THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY

8/28/2014: SUMMONS SERVED - THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY

EXHIBIT A - AUTO DECLARATIONS

8/11/2014: EXHIBIT A - AUTO DECLARATIONS

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2014090631

8/8/2014: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2014090631

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY - ISSUED 8/8/14

8/8/2014: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY - ISSUED 8/8/14

COMPLAINT

8/8/2014: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

8/8/2014: CIVIL COVER SHEET

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2015060515)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBPOENA RETURNED - SERVED - SARASOTA COUTNY EMS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUESTS FOR COPIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COPIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTHE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY'S SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF CONSORTIUM INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTHE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE-APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT A - AUTO DECLARATIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2014
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$410.00; Amount Paid:$410.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2014090631

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY - ISSUED 8/8/14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRESTON, DAVID

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EASTMOORE, THEODORE CHARLES