This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/14/2020 at 10:18:08 (UTC).

GUSTAFSON, JULIE VS CHALLENGE PROPERTIES II INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/13/2020 GUSTAFSON, JULIE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CHALLENGE PROPERTIES II INC. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RUHL, MARIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7 SC

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RUHL, MARIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUSTAFSON, JULIE

Defendants

CHALLENGE PROPERTIES II INC

RACETRAC PETROLEUM INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FARROW, TIMOTHY MALCOLM

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS SERVED - CHALLENGE PROPERTIES II

2/12/2020: SUMMONS SERVED - CHALLENGE PROPERTIES II

PAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2020009681

1/28/2020: PAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2020009681

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

1/28/2020: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

NOTICE - OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

1/28/2020: NOTICE - OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

SUMMONS- PROPOSED - CHALLENGE PROPERTIES II INC - DUPLICATE SUMMONS - PREVIOUSLY ISSUED

1/28/2020: SUMMONS- PROPOSED - CHALLENGE PROPERTIES II INC - DUPLICATE SUMMONS - PREVIOUSLY ISSUED

SUMMONS- PROPOSED - CHALLENGE PROPERTIES II INC - DUPLICATE SUMMONS - PREVIOUSLY ISSUED

1/28/2020: SUMMONS- PROPOSED - CHALLENGE PROPERTIES II INC - DUPLICATE SUMMONS - PREVIOUSLY ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVING - INTERROGATORIES

1/28/2020: NOTICE OF SERVING - INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

1/28/2020: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

1/28/2020: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - RACETRAC PETROLEUM INC - ISSUED 01/28/2020

1/28/2020: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - RACETRAC PETROLEUM INC - ISSUED 01/28/2020

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - CHALLENGE PROPERTIES II INC - ISSUED 01/28/2020

1/28/2020: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - CHALLENGE PROPERTIES II INC - ISSUED 01/28/2020

PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2020004199

1/13/2020: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2020004199

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/13/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT - AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

1/13/2020: COMPLAINT - AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/13/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - CHALLENGE PROPERTIES II

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2020009681

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED - CHALLENGE PROPERTIES II INC - DUPLICATE SUMMONS - PREVIOUSLY ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED - CHALLENGE PROPERTIES II INC - DUPLICATE SUMMONS - PREVIOUSLY ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING - INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - RACETRAC PETROLEUM INC - ISSUED 01/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - CHALLENGE PROPERTIES II INC - ISSUED 01/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$420.00; Amount Paid:$420.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2020004199

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less