This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 13:32:37 (UTC).

GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION Et Al VS JACLYN ELIZABETH NARDELLA AKA JACLYN NARDELLA

Case Summary

On 12/14/2018 GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JACLYN ELIZABETH NARDELLA AKA JACLYN NARDELLA. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 NC

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

GTE FINANCIAL

Defendant

JACLYN ELIZABETH NARDELLA AKA JACLYN NARDELLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOUCH, JEFFREY

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE - OF MAILING - AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT

10/16/2019: CERTIFICATE - OF MAILING - AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT

JUDGMENT - RECORDED - AMENDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019128657)

9/17/2019: JUDGMENT - RECORDED - AMENDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019128657)

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

9/9/2019: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

NOTICE OF HEARING

7/24/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

7/1/2019: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

AFFIDAVIT - INTEREST AND COSTS

6/17/2019: AFFIDAVIT - INTEREST AND COSTS

AFFIDAVIT - COSTS AND FEES

6/17/2019: AFFIDAVIT - COSTS AND FEES

AFFIDAVIT - ATTORNEY FEES

6/17/2019: AFFIDAVIT - ATTORNEY FEES

NOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVDITS (NOT ATTACHED)

6/17/2019: NOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVDITS (NOT ATTACHED)

MOTION - INTEREST AND ATTORNEY FEES

6/17/2019: MOTION - INTEREST AND ATTORNEY FEES

JUDGMENT - RECORDED - DEFENDANTS - Recorded (OR. / 2019059355)

5/7/2019: JUDGMENT - RECORDED - DEFENDANTS - Recorded (OR. / 2019059355)

AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF CLAIM AND NON MILITARY SERVICE

4/30/2019: AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF CLAIM AND NON MILITARY SERVICE

NOTICE - FILING

4/30/2019: NOTICE - FILING

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

4/30/2019: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

DEFAULT - JACLYN ELIZABETH NARDELLA AKA JACLYN NARDELLA

3/20/2019: DEFAULT - JACLYN ELIZABETH NARDELLA AKA JACLYN NARDELLA

SUMMONS SERVED - JACLYN ELIZABETH NARDELLA A/K/A JACLYN NARDELLA

2/10/2019: SUMMONS SERVED - JACLYN ELIZABETH NARDELLA A/K/A JACLYN NARDELLA

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - JACLYN ELIZABETH NARDELLA - ISSUED 12/14/2018

12/13/2018: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - JACLYN ELIZABETH NARDELLA - ISSUED 12/14/2018

COMPLAINT - COUNTY

12/13/2018: COMPLAINT - COUNTY

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE - OF MAILING - AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - RECORDED - AMENDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019128657)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 2B; Description:MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 2B; Description:MOTIONS ;Court Result:CANCELLED BY JACS INTERFACE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Sep 9 2019 9:00AM JUDGE: MOSS, DANA LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • Docket*** CANCELLED - COURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Sep 9 2019 9:00AM JUDGE: MOSS, DANA LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Sep 9 2019 9:00AM JUDGE: MOSS, DANA LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT - JACLYN ELIZABETH NARDELLA AKA JACLYN NARDELLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - NON MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - JACLYN ELIZABETH NARDELLA AKA JACLYN NARDELLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - JACLYN ELIZABETH NARDELLA A/K/A JACLYN NARDELLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$310.00; Amount Paid:$310.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2018124742

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - JACLYN ELIZABETH NARDELLA - ISSUED 12/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less