This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/17/2020 at 07:34:17 (UTC).

GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION Et Al VS ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER AND AGAINST THE HEREIN NAMED INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS WHO ARE NOT KNOWN TO BE DEAD OR ALIVE WHETHER SAID UNKNOWN PARTIES MAY CLAIM AN INTEREST AS SPOUSES HEIRS DEVIS

Case Summary

On 03/08/2018 GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER AND AGAINST THE HEREIN NAMED INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS WHO ARE NOT KNOWN TO BE DEAD OR ALIVE WHETHER SAID UNKNOWN PARTIES MAY CLAIM AN INTEREST AS SPOUSES HEIRS DEVIS. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MERCURIO, FREDERICK P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7 NC

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MERCURIO, FREDERICK P

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

GTE FINANCIAL

Defendants

ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER AND AGAINST THE HEREIN NAMED INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS WHO ARE NOT KNOWN TO BE DEAD OR ALIVE WHETHER SAID UNKNOWN PARTIES MAY CLAIM AN INTEREST AS SPOUSES HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES OR OTHER CLAIMANTS

GHALAYINI, AMANDA

RAHMAN GHALAYINI, ZAKARIA ABDUL

UNKNOWN PARTY 1

GHALAYINI, ZAKARIA

UNKNOWN PARTY 4

GHALAYINI, ZAKARIA AR

CITY OF SARASOTA FLORIDA

GAHAYALINI, ZAKARIA A

GAHALAYINI, AMANDA J

UNKNOWN PARTY 3

UNKNOWN PARTY 2

LAUREL OAK COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SLIGER, CHAD

Defendant Attorneys

GRAHAM, H

SHAMSEY, JOHN

OLAH, PAUL

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN PARTY #2

5/11/2018: SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN PARTY #2

SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN PARTY #1

5/11/2018: SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN PARTY #1

SUMMONS SERVED - LAUREL OAKS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

5/11/2018: SUMMONS SERVED - LAUREL OAKS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

SUMMONS SERVED - CITY OF SARASOTA, FLORIDA

5/11/2018: SUMMONS SERVED - CITY OF SARASOTA, FLORIDA

SUMMONS SERVED - AMANDA GHALAYINI A/K/A AMANDA J GHALAYINI

5/11/2018: SUMMONS SERVED - AMANDA GHALAYINI A/K/A AMANDA J GHALAYINI

DISMISSAL AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS - FORECLOSURE FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018058944)

5/3/2018: DISMISSAL AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS - FORECLOSURE FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018058944)

MOTION - EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND

5/2/2018: MOTION - EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND

NOTICE UNAVAILABILITY

5/2/2018: NOTICE UNAVAILABILITY

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

5/2/2018: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- ZAKARIA A GAHAYALINI AKA ZAKARIA GHALAYINI AKA ZAKARIA ABDUL RAHMAN GHALAYINI AKA ZAKARIA AR HHALAYINI - ISSUED 03/08/2018

3/8/2018: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- ZAKARIA A GAHAYALINI AKA ZAKARIA GHALAYINI AKA ZAKARIA ABDUL RAHMAN GHALAYINI AKA ZAKARIA AR HHALAYINI - ISSUED 03/08/2018

FORECLOSURE FORM B

3/8/2018: FORECLOSURE FORM B

FORECLOSURE FORM A

3/8/2018: FORECLOSURE FORM A

NOTICE

3/8/2018: NOTICE

LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018030062)

3/8/2018: LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018030062)

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

3/8/2018: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

3/8/2018: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

COMPLAINT FORECLS >$50,000-249,999.99

3/8/2018: COMPLAINT FORECLS >$50,000-249,999.99

CIVIL COVER SHEET

3/8/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN PARTY #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN PARTY #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - LAUREL OAKS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - CITY OF SARASOTA, FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - AMANDA GHALAYINI A/K/A AMANDA J GHALAYINI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS - FORECLOSURE FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018058944)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - FOR AMANDA GHALAYINI

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- LAUREL OAK COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC - ISSUED 03/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- ZAKARIA A GAHAYALINI AKA ZAKARIA GHALAYINI AKA ZAKARIA ABDUL RAHMAN GHALAYINI AKA ZAKARIA AR HHALAYINI - ISSUED 03/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE FORM B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE FORM A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018030062)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FORECLS >$50,000-249,999.99

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less