This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/14/2020 at 15:09:38 (UTC).

GRUNDVIG, BROOKE ANN, GRUNDVIG, BROOKE ANN Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 GRUNDVIG, BROOKE ANN, GRUNDVIG, BROOKE ANN was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 SC

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Yet Classified

GRUNDVIG, BROOKE ANN

MILTON-GRUNDVIG, BROOKE ANN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2017
  • DocketACTION:THE IDENTIFIER FOR THIS SUBMISSION IS 18681159, SUBMITTED AT 3/27/2017 8:34:44 AM.NAME CHANGE SUBMITTED TO FDLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • HearingTime:10:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM J; Description:HEARING - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketREPORT - NAME CHANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketPAYMENT $0.00 RECEIPT #2017029106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketJUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT OF NAME CHANGE FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2017035956)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF FINAL HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: HEARING - CIVIL DATE: Mar 24 2017 10:00AM JUDGE: BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$400.00; Amount Paid:$400.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2017021342

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • DocketPETITION FOR NAME CHANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less