This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/16/2021 at 06:46:18 (UTC).

GROW FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION VS BOYD, RACHAEL Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/03/2018 GROW FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BOYD, RACHAEL. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GALEN, PHYLLIS R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 NC

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GALEN, PHYLLIS R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GROW FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendants

KEITH D SYLVESTER AKA KEITH SYLVESTER

BOYD, RACHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOUCH, JEFFREY

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT - AGAINST DEFENDANT(S) - RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019066128)

5/20/2019: JUDGMENT - AGAINST DEFENDANT(S) - RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019066128)

NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVITS - AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE, AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS AND FEES, AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES, AFFIDAVIT OF INTEREST AND COSTS

5/14/2019: NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVITS - AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE, AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS AND FEES, AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES, AFFIDAVIT OF INTEREST AND COSTS

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

5/14/2019: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - KEITH D SYLVESTER AKA KEITH SYLVESTER

4/10/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - KEITH D SYLVESTER AKA KEITH SYLVESTER

SUMMONS SERVED - ALIAS - KEITH D SYLVESTER AKA KEITH SYLVESTER

4/2/2019: SUMMONS SERVED - ALIAS - KEITH D SYLVESTER AKA KEITH SYLVESTER

AFFIDAVIT - NON-MILITARY

3/14/2019: AFFIDAVIT - NON-MILITARY

SUMMONS SERVED - ALIAS - RACHAEL BOYD

2/10/2019: SUMMONS SERVED - ALIAS - RACHAEL BOYD

SUMMONS NON SERVED - RACHEL BOYD

10/22/2018: SUMMONS NON SERVED - RACHEL BOYD

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - RACHAEL BOYD - ISSUED 08/03/2018

8/3/2018: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - RACHAEL BOYD - ISSUED 08/03/2018

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

7/18/2019: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

DEFAULT - RACHAEL BOYD

3/15/2019: DEFAULT - RACHAEL BOYD

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - RACHAEL BOYD AND KEITH D SYLVESTER AKA KEITH SYLVESTER

3/14/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - RACHAEL BOYD AND KEITH D SYLVESTER AKA KEITH SYLVESTER

PAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2018109877

10/31/2018: PAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2018109877

SUMMONS ALIAS COUNTY - EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - RACHAEL BOYD - ISSUED 10/31/18

10/31/2018: SUMMONS ALIAS COUNTY - EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - RACHAEL BOYD - ISSUED 10/31/18

SUMMONS NON SERVED - KEITH D SYLVESTER A/K/A KEITH SYLVESTER

10/22/2018: SUMMONS NON SERVED - KEITH D SYLVESTER A/K/A KEITH SYLVESTER

PAYMENT $320.00 RECEIPT #2018079148

8/3/2018: PAYMENT $320.00 RECEIPT #2018079148

COMPLAINT - COUNTY

8/3/2018: COMPLAINT - COUNTY

CIVIL COVER SHEET

8/3/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - AGAINST DEFENDANT(S) - RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019066128)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVITS - AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE, AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS AND FEES, AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES, AFFIDAVIT OF INTEREST AND COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT - KEITH D SYLVESTER AKA KEITH SYLVESTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - NON MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - KEITH D SYLVESTER AKA KEITH SYLVESTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - ALIAS - KEITH D SYLVESTER AKA KEITH SYLVESTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT - RACHAEL BOYD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketACTION: UNABLE TO ISSUE DEFAULT - KEITH D SYLVESTER AKA KEITH SYLVESTER NAME ON AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DOES NOT MATCH COMPLAINT AND SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ALIAS COUNTY - EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - RACHAEL BOYD - ISSUED 10/31/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ALIAS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - KEITH D SYLVESTER AKA KEITH SYLVESTER - ISSUED 10/31/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS NON SERVED - KEITH D SYLVESTER A/K/A KEITH SYLVESTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS NON SERVED - RACHEL BOYD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$340.00; Amount Paid:$340.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $320.00 RECEIPT #2018079148

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - KEITH D SYLVESTER AKA KEITH SYLVESTER - ISSUED 08/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - RACHAEL BOYD - ISSUED 08/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less