This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 01/24/2021 at 01:57:16 (UTC).

GREENLAW, ROSSELLINE VS ATRIA INC

Case Summary

On 10/29/2019 GREENLAW, ROSSELLINE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ATRIA INC. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RUHL, MARIA and WALKER, STEPHEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 NC

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RUHL, MARIA

WALKER, STEPHEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GREENLAW, ROSSELLINE

Defendants

ATRIA INC

HCP HB2 WATERSIDE RETIREMENT ESTATES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAPIRO, M

 

Court Documents

CORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC - FROM ADAM P SHAPIRO

8/31/2020: CORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC - FROM ADAM P SHAPIRO

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL - AGAINST ATRIA INC ONLY

8/27/2020: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL - AGAINST ATRIA INC ONLY

CORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC - FROM ADAM P SHAPIRO

8/27/2020: CORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC - FROM ADAM P SHAPIRO

CORRESPONDENCE

8/25/2020: CORRESPONDENCE

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL - DROPPING PARTY ATRIA INC ONLY

2/21/2020: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL - DROPPING PARTY ATRIA INC ONLY

SUMMONS SERVED - HCP HB2 WATERSIDE RETIREMENT ESTATES, LLC

1/30/2020: SUMMONS SERVED - HCP HB2 WATERSIDE RETIREMENT ESTATES, LLC

MOTION - TO DISMISS AND/OR COMPEL ARBITRATION WITH MEMORANDUM OF LAW

1/7/2020: MOTION - TO DISMISS AND/OR COMPEL ARBITRATION WITH MEMORANDUM OF LAW

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

1/7/2020: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - HCP HB2 WATERSIDE RETIREMENT ESTATES, LLC

1/7/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - HCP HB2 WATERSIDE RETIREMENT ESTATES, LLC

SUMMONS SERVED - ATRIA INC

11/21/2019: SUMMONS SERVED - ATRIA INC

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2019108090

10/29/2019: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2019108090

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION- TO DEFENDANT

10/29/2019: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION- TO DEFENDANT

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- ATRIA INC- ISSUED 10/29/2019

10/29/2019: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- ATRIA INC- ISSUED 10/29/2019

NOTICE- INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

10/29/2019: NOTICE- INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS- TO DEFENDANT

10/29/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS- TO DEFENDANT

COMPLAINT

10/29/2019: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/29/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/29/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC - FROM ADAM P SHAPIRO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL - AGAINST ATRIA INC ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC - FROM ADAM P SHAPIRO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL - DROPPING PARTY ATRIA INC ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - HCP HB2 WATERSIDE RETIREMENT ESTATES, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - TO DISMISS AND/OR COMPEL ARBITRATION WITH MEMORANDUM OF LAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - HCP HB2 WATERSIDE RETIREMENT ESTATES, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - PLURIES -HCP HB2 WATERSIDE RETIREMENT ESTATES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - ATRIA INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$420.00; Amount Paid:$420.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2019108090

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION- TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- ATRIA INC- ISSUED 10/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS- TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WG Encinitas SH LP; DBA : Atria Senior Living Group Inc;DBA : Atria Encinitas North is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAPIRO, M