This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/27/2021 at 10:37:37 (UTC).

GREAT SOUTHERN BANK VS BURNETTE, THOMAS ALLEN

Case Summary

On 01/06/2014 GREAT SOUTHERN BANK filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BURNETTE, THOMAS ALLEN. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BOEHM, MARYANN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BOEHM, MARYANN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GREAT SOUTHERN BANK

Defendant

BURNETTE, THOMAS ALLEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AVRUTIS, THOMAS

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF MAILING

8/14/2015: NOTICE OF MAILING

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

7/28/2014: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2014001710

1/6/2014: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2014001710

SUMMONS SERVED- THOMAS ALLEN BURNETTE- SUB SERVED- CB

2/10/2014: SUMMONS SERVED- THOMAS ALLEN BURNETTE- SUB SERVED- CB

ANSWER OF GARNISHEE NO ATTORNEY FEE DEMANDED - CADENCE BANK

8/17/2015: ANSWER OF GARNISHEE NO ATTORNEY FEE DEMANDED - CADENCE BANK

JUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - SUMMARY - RECORDED (OR. / 2014088961)

7/28/2014: JUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - SUMMARY - RECORDED (OR. / 2014088961)

ANSWER - THOMAS ALLEN BURNETTE

2/19/2014: ANSWER - THOMAS ALLEN BURNETTE

NOTICE OF FILING - CERTIFICATE OF NON-ATTENDANCE

5/16/2016: NOTICE OF FILING - CERTIFICATE OF NON-ATTENDANCE

AFFIDAVIT- SUPPORT OF DEFAULT AND DAMAGES

4/16/2014: AFFIDAVIT- SUPPORT OF DEFAULT AND DAMAGES

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM THOMAS L. AVRUTIS, ESQ.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DISMISSING CASE AND APPROVING STIPULATION - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2017083799)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT & JUDGMENT IN THE EVENT OF NON-PAYMENT OF DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE - THOMAS BURNETTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION IN AID OF EXECUTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - CERTIFICATE OF NON-ATTENDANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBPOENA RETURNED - SERVED - THOMAS ALLEN BURNETTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION IN AID OF EXECUTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER - THOMAS ALLEN BURNETTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED- THOMAS ALLEN BURNETTE- SUB SERVED- CB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2014
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$395.00; Amount Paid:$395.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2014001710

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE ASSESSED $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - THOMAS ALLEN BURNETTE - ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2014
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/06/2014 CASE NUMBER 2014 CC 000050 NC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GREAT SOUTHERN BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Avrutis, Thomas L