This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 10/09/2020 at 17:31:52 (UTC).

GRAY, JANE VS JS #2 INVESTMENT, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 GRAY, JANE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JS 2 INVESTMENT, INC. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARROLL, HUNTER W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************6 NC

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARROLL, HUNTER W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRAY, JANE

Defendant

JS #2 INVESTMENT, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JENSEN, ADRIA

GROSSO, JENNIFER

Defendant Attorney

LANZA-SUTTON, MARIEL

 

Court Documents

ORDER - GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY AND DIRECTING THE CLERK OF COURT TO UPDATE THE CASE MANAGEMENT SYSTEM

10/8/2020: ORDER - GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY AND DIRECTING THE CLERK OF COURT TO UPDATE THE CASE MANAGEMENT SYSTEM

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/7/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

10/7/2020: STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

10/4/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - AMENDED - Recorded (OR. / 2020133986)

9/28/2020: LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - AMENDED - Recorded (OR. / 2020133986)

PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2020075864

9/25/2020: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2020075864

COMPLAINT

9/25/2020: COMPLAINT

LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2020132616)

9/25/2020: LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2020132616)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/25/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY AND DIRECTING THE CLERK OF COURT TO UPDATE THE CASE MANAGEMENT SYSTEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - AMENDED - Recorded (OR. / 2020133986)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$400.00; Amount Paid:$400.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2020075864

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2020132616)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less