This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/15/2020 at 12:59:57 (UTC).

GRAHAM, J MAURICE VS CEDAR GROVE AT THE WOODLANDS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 GRAHAM, J MAURICE filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CEDAR GROVE AT THE WOODLANDS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MERCURIO, FREDERICK P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7 NC

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MERCURIO, FREDERICK P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRAHAM, J MAURICE

Defendants

KULICK, REBECCA D

DOE, JANE

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

THE WOODLANDS MASTER ASSOCIATION INC

DOE, JOHN

CEDAR GROVE AT THE WOODLANDS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

KULICK, JENNIFER L

KULICK, SHANE M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KOTEEN, MARK ALAN

Defendant Attorneys

MARTELLA, MARK

THOMSON, S

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS - FILED AND RECORDED

1/26/2018: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS - FILED AND RECORDED

DEFAULT - - JENNIFER L KULICK

12/29/2017: DEFAULT - - JENNIFER L KULICK

ENTRY FOR DEFAULT - PROPOSED

12/28/2017: ENTRY FOR DEFAULT - PROPOSED

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

12/28/2017: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

ENTRY FOR DEFAULT - PROPOSED

12/28/2017: ENTRY FOR DEFAULT - PROPOSED

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - AMENDED - JENNIFER L KULICK

12/28/2017: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - AMENDED - JENNIFER L KULICK

SUMMONS SERVED - SHANE M KULICK, REBECCA D. KULICK

12/28/2017: SUMMONS SERVED - SHANE M KULICK, REBECCA D. KULICK

CERTIFICATE- OF MAILING NOTICE OF ACTION SHANE M KULICK REBECCA D KULICK JOHN DOE AND JANDE DOE

12/20/2017: CERTIFICATE- OF MAILING NOTICE OF ACTION SHANE M KULICK REBECCA D KULICK JOHN DOE AND JANDE DOE

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - DOCUMENTS

12/18/2017: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - DOCUMENTS

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- JOHN DOE - ISSUED 09/27/2017

9/26/2017: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- JOHN DOE - ISSUED 09/27/2017

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- REBECCA D KULICK - ISSUED 09/27/2017

9/26/2017: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- REBECCA D KULICK - ISSUED 09/27/2017

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- SHANE M KULICK - ISSUED 09/27/2017

9/26/2017: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- SHANE M KULICK - ISSUED 09/27/2017

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

9/26/2017: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

CERTIFICATE- OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTES SECTION 702 154 4

9/26/2017: CERTIFICATE- OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTES SECTION 702 154 4

NOTICE- VALUE

9/26/2017: NOTICE- VALUE

LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2017119415)

9/26/2017: LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2017119415)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/26/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FORECLS >$50,000-249,999.99

9/26/2017: COMPLAINT FORECLS >$50,000-249,999.99

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS - FILED AND RECORDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketACTION: DEFAULT NOT ENTERED ON STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE AS NO PROOF OF SERVICE IS ON FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT - - JENNIFER L KULICK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY FOR DEFAULT - PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY FOR DEFAULT - PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - AMENDED - JENNIFER L KULICK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - SHANE M KULICK, REBECCA D. KULICK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE- OF MAILING NOTICE OF ACTION SHANE M KULICK REBECCA D KULICK JOHN DOE AND JANDE DOE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- JANE DOE - ISSUED 09/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- JOHN DOE - ISSUED 09/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- REBECCA D KULICK - ISSUED 09/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- SHANE M KULICK - ISSUED 09/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE- OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTES SECTION 702 154 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- VALUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2017119415)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FORECLS >$50,000-249,999.99

    Read MoreRead Less