Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/10/2021 at 15:36:54 (UTC).

GRABISCH, KEITH VS GRABISCH, LISA RAYMOND

Case Summary

On 10/26/2020 GRABISCH, KEITH filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GRABISCH, LISA RAYMOND. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are KRUG, THOMAS and RUHL, MARIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7 NC

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

KRUG, THOMAS

RUHL, MARIA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GRABISCH, KEITH

Respondent

GRABISCH, LISA RAYMOND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

COLE, RICHARD JOHN II

Respondent Attorney

WALLACE, JAIME LYNN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2021
  • HearingTime:01:30 PM; Location:COURTROOM ZOOM; Description:MOTIONS ;Court Result:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNOTICE - OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING CORRECTED FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - KEITH GRABISCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING - AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Feb 22 2021 1:30PM JUDGE: RUHL, MARIA LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketNOTICE - CASE ACTION OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE - OBJECTION TO REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 10/24/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED: CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE-NAME DOES NOT MATCH PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE -STANDIDNG ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2020
  • DocketAGREEMENT -PRENUPTIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE-RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE-CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE-SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer COLE, RICHARD JOHN II