This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 07/09/2021 at 21:00:23 (UTC).

GOODMAN, NANCY I, MCPEEK, A BRENT Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/04/2021 GOODMAN, NANCY I, MCPEEK, A BRENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARROLL, HUNTER W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 SC

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARROLL, HUNTER W

 

Party Details

Decedent

GOODMAN, NANCY I

Applicant

MCPEEK, A BRENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

MCPEEK, ALAN BRENT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION- 7/2/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2021108976)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketWILL ADMITTED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2021107406)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketACTION: EMAILED PROPOSED ORDER (DIN 4) TO COURTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$400.00; Amount Paid:$400.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2021048525

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketWILL- ORIGINAL PAPER-FILED SCANNED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketORDER - PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION (SOUTH COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE - PUBLIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCPEEK, ALAN BRENT