This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/21/2022 at 09:13:47 (UTC).

GOODMAN, DUANE VS NELLIS, BARBARA

Case Summary

On 03/23/2021 GOODMAN, DUANE filed an Other lawsuit against NELLIS, BARBARA. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARROLL, HUNTER W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 SC

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARROLL, HUNTER W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOODMAN, DUANE

Defendant

NELLIS, BARBARA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TELFAIR, CHARLES WARD

Defendant Attorney

WOOD, J

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

1/10/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE - SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

8/2/2021: NOTICE - SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE - SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

7/28/2021: NOTICE - SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

NOTICE - SERVING RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

7/20/2021: NOTICE - SERVING RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE - SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

7/20/2021: NOTICE - SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

6/29/2021: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE - OF SERVICE INTERROGATORIES

6/11/2021: NOTICE - OF SERVICE INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

6/11/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

ORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

5/24/2021: ORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2022
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM H; Description:JURY TRIAL - CIVIL SC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • HearingTime:08:45 AM; Location:COURTROOM H; Description:MANDATORY DOCKET SOUNDING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • HearingTime:09:30 AM; Location:COURTROOM H; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES SOUTH COUNTY - CIRCUIT COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERVING RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OF SERVICE INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - BARBARA NELLIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - BARBARA NELLIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$410.00; Amount Paid:$410.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021025195

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- BARBARA NELLIS - ISSUED - BARBARA NELLIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (SOUTH COUNTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TELFAIR, CHARLES WARD