This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 02/19/2020 at 00:17:20 (UTC).

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/02/2019 GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MOSS, DANA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7 NC

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MOSS, DANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAYNARD, MARK

Defendant Attorney

HOFFMAN, STEPHANIE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

7/16/2019: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

5/29/2019: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

5/29/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE - SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

5/29/2019: NOTICE - SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

ORDER PIP - CASE MANAGEMENT

5/21/2019: ORDER PIP - CASE MANAGEMENT

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

5/21/2019: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - CANCELLATION OF SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION

5/9/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - CANCELLATION OF SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION

SUMMONS SERVED - GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY - NOTICE OF FILING SERVICE OF PROCESS

4/18/2019: SUMMONS SERVED - GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY - NOTICE OF FILING SERVICE OF PROCESS

PAYMENT $90.00 RECEIPT #2019033624

4/2/2019: PAYMENT $90.00 RECEIPT #2019033624

REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - SMALL CLAIMS SUMMONS - GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY - DUPLICATE REQUEST - PREVIOUSLY ISSUED 4/2/2019

4/2/2019: REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - SMALL CLAIMS SUMMONS - GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY - DUPLICATE REQUEST - PREVIOUSLY ISSUED 4/2/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY-=GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

4/2/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY-=GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS- PROPOSED

4/2/2019: SUMMONS- PROPOSED

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

4/2/2019: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $100 TO $500

4/2/2019: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $100 TO $500

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • HearingTime:10:30 AM; Location:COURTROOM 2B; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER PIP - CASE MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - CANCELLATION OF SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY - NOTICE OF FILING SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$90.00; Amount Paid:$90.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $90.00 RECEIPT #2019033624

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - SMALL CLAIMS SUMMONS - GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY - DUPLICATE REQUEST - PREVIOUSLY ISSUED 4/2/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY-=GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 05/21/2019 AT 10:30 AM IN 2B , JDG: MOSS, DANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - $100 TO $500

    Read MoreRead Less