This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 03/22/2022 at 18:02:13 (UTC).

GARDENHIRE, DAWN Et Al VS FAMILY SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 GARDENHIRE, DAWN filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against FAMILY SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MCHUGH, ANDREA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MCHUGH, ANDREA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GARDENHIRE, DAWN

GARDENHIRE, MATTHEW

Defendant

FAMILY SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOFFMAN, JONATHAN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/21/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- FAMILY SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY

1/21/2022: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- FAMILY SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE- OF INTERROGATORIES

1/21/2022: NOTICE- OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

1/21/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

1/21/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

COMPLAINT- & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

1/21/2022: COMPLAINT- & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022006254

1/21/2022: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022006254

ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

1/24/2022: ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2022
  • HearingTime:01:30 PM; Location:COURTROOM 6C; Description:CASE MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 06/10/2022 AT 1:30 PM IN 6C , JDG: MCHUGH, ANDREA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$410.00; Amount Paid:$410.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022006254

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- FAMILY SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY - ISSUED 1/27/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT- & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FAMILY SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JONATHAN HOFFMAN