This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 07/09/2023 at 14:36:18 (UTC).

FURMAN, TRACY VS BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS SARASOTA COUNTY

Case Summary

On 03/23/2023 FURMAN, TRACY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS SARASOTA COUNTY. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARROLL, HUNTER W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 NC

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARROLL, HUNTER W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FURMAN, TRACY

Defendant

BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS SARASOTA COUNTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JAFFE, MARTIN J

ROSARIO, WILLIAM

ROMANO, FRANCO

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

3/21/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

3/21/2023: COMPLAINT

PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2023029053

3/24/2023: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2023029053

ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

4/5/2023: ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION - DESIGNATION EMAIL ADDRESSES

5/8/2023: NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION - DESIGNATION EMAIL ADDRESSES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

5/8/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE - SERVING INTERROGATORIES

5/8/2023: NOTICE - SERVING INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

5/8/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

SUMMONS - PROPOSED - CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE SUMMONS - DOCUMENTS ATTACHED

5/8/2023: SUMMONS - PROPOSED - CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE SUMMONS - DOCUMENTS ATTACHED

PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2023045116

5/8/2023: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2023045116

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

6/9/2023: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

6/16/2023: NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

6/29/2023: NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2023
  • HearingTime: 08:30 AM; Location: COURTROOM 6C; Description: CASE MANAGEMENT; Court Result: CANC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2023045116

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS - PROPOSED - CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE SUMMONS - DOCUMENTS ATTACHED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION - DESIGNATION EMAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 08/08/2023 AT 8:30 AM IN 6C , JDG: CARROLL, HUNTER W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2023029053

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $410.00; Amount Paid: $410.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT; Total Fee: $400.00; Amount Paid: $400.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less