This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/18/2020 at 02:29:43 (UTC).

FRYZIUK, DARIA VS AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/15/2018 FRYZIUK, DARIA filed an Other lawsuit against AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MCHUGH, ANDREA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 NC

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MCHUGH, ANDREA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRYZIUK, DARIA

Defendant

AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOODNOW, JAMES

Defendant Attorney

SPANO, BRYCE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL- WITH PREJUDICE BOLUNTARY

6/27/2019: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL- WITH PREJUDICE BOLUNTARY

ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE

4/26/2019: ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE

MOTION - TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

4/23/2019: MOTION - TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - DUCES TECUM

2/12/2019: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - DUCES TECUM

NOTICE - SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

2/11/2019: NOTICE - SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

NOTICE - SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

2/6/2019: NOTICE - SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

2/6/2019: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

ANSWER DEFENSES & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - AMENDED

1/7/2019: ANSWER DEFENSES & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - AMENDED

NOTICE - SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

12/11/2018: NOTICE - SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2018083182

8/15/2018: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2018083182

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE COMPANY- ISSUED 08/15/2018

8/15/2018: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE COMPANY- ISSUED 08/15/2018

NOTICE- SPOLIATION LETTER TO DEFENDANT

8/15/2018: NOTICE- SPOLIATION LETTER TO DEFENDANT

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION- PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST

8/15/2018: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION- PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS- PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST

8/15/2018: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS- PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST

NOTICE- INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

8/15/2018: NOTICE- INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

8/15/2018: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

CIVIL COVER SHEET

8/15/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT-AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

8/15/2018: COMPLAINT-AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL- WITH PREJUDICE BOLUNTARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - DUCES TECUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER DEFENSES & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - PRIVILEGE LOG

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$410.00; Amount Paid:$410.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2018083182

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE COMPANY- ISSUED 08/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- SPOLIATION LETTER TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION- PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS- PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less