This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 03/07/2023 at 18:01:18 (UTC).

FORD, CAROL A VS CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2023 FORD, CAROL A filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARROLL, HUNTER W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARROLL, HUNTER W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORD, CAROL A

Defendants

CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY

GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NICHOLS, RYAN

Defendant Attorney

GELMAN, BRETT

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

2/20/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

2/20/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE - SERVING INTERROGATORIES

2/20/2023: NOTICE - SERVING INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE - DISCLOSURE

2/20/2023: NOTICE - DISCLOSURE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

2/20/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURURANCE COMPANY

2/20/2023: ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS SERVED - GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

2/5/2023: SUMMONS SERVED - GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS SERVED - THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY

2/5/2023: SUMMONS SERVED - THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY

ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

1/26/2023: ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2023
  • HearingTime: 01:30 PM; Location: COURTROOM 6C; Description: CASE MANAGEMENT; Court Result: CNCL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • HearingTime: 01:30 PM; Location: COURTROOM 6C; Description: CASE MANAGEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - DISCLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT; Total Fee: $400.00; Amount Paid: $400.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023001820

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY - ISSUED 1/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY - ISSUED 1/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less