This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 02/14/2020 at 22:35:56 (UTC).

FLORIDA SUNSHINE TRANSPORT INC VS USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/18/2017 FLORIDA SUNSHINE TRANSPORT INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DENKIN, DAVID LEE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 NC

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DENKIN, DAVID LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLORIDA SUNSHINE TRANSPORT INC

Defendant

USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAYNARD, MARK

Defendant Attorneys

KATZ, JACQUELINE

COLESANTI, PHILIP

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING VERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S IONITIAL INTERROGATORIES

10/10/2017: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING VERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S IONITIAL INTERROGATORIES

DEFENDANT'S PRIVILEGE LOG

9/27/2017: DEFENDANT'S PRIVILEGE LOG

DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

9/5/2017: DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

8/29/2017: AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

7/12/2017: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

7/12/2017: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

PIP CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

7/5/2017: PIP CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

5/18/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

5/18/2017: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL - VOLUNTARY

4/9/2019: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL - VOLUNTARY

NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION

4/25/2018: NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION

NOTICE - OF SERVING OFFER OF SETTLEMENT

10/13/2017: NOTICE - OF SERVING OFFER OF SETTLEMENT

DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

9/27/2017: DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

8/9/2017: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

7/5/2017: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CANCELLATION OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION

6/26/2017: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CANCELLATION OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION

NOTICE OF FILING - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - SUMMONS SERVED - USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

6/8/2017: NOTICE OF FILING - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - SUMMONS SERVED - USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

SUMMONS- PROPOSED- USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

5/18/2017: SUMMONS- PROPOSED- USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL - VOLUNTARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OF SERVING OFFER OF SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING VERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S IONITIAL INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S PRIVILEGE LOG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM JACQUELINE KATZ, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CANCELLATION OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - SUMMONS SERVED - USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$65.00; Amount Paid:$65.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2017048657

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 07/05/2017 AT 10:30 AM IN 5C , JDG: DENKIN, DAVID LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED- USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less