This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 02:40:49 (UTC).

FLORIDA SUNSHINE TRANSPORT INC AAO SHANTIA JOH VS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/17/2018 FLORIDA SUNSHINE TRANSPORT INC AAO SHANTIA JOH filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DENKIN, DAVID LEE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 NC

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DENKIN, DAVID LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLORIDA SUNSHINE TRANSPORT INC AAO SHANTIA JOH

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAYNARD, MARK

Defendant Attorney

PECKHAM, ALEXANDER

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

9/27/2018: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

9/27/2018: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE - SERVING INTERROGATORIES

9/27/2018: NOTICE - SERVING INTERROGATORIES

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

9/25/2018: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

DEFENDANT'S MOTION - EXTENSION OF TIME - RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

9/24/2018: DEFENDANT'S MOTION - EXTENSION OF TIME - RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

9/18/2018: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

8/17/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

8/17/2018: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00

8/17/2018: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

10/29/2018: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

ANSWER AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - DEFENDANT

10/12/2018: ANSWER AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - DEFENDANT

AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

10/5/2018: AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

ORDER - PIP CASE MANAGEMENT

9/25/2018: ORDER - PIP CASE MANAGEMENT

MOTION TO INVOKE THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

9/18/2018: MOTION TO INVOKE THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE / CANCELLATION OF SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE / MEDIATION - DEFENDANT

9/18/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE / CANCELLATION OF SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE / MEDIATION - DEFENDANT

NOTICE - SERVICE OF PROCESS - BY CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER STATE OF FLORIDA - STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (NOTICE OF FILING)

8/29/2018: NOTICE - SERVICE OF PROCESS - BY CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER STATE OF FLORIDA - STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (NOTICE OF FILING)

PAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2018084194

8/17/2018: PAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2018084194

SUMMONS- PROPOSED - STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

8/17/2018: SUMMONS- PROPOSED - STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • HearingTime:10:30 AM; Location:COURTROOM 5C; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PIP CASE MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION - EXTENSION OF TIME - RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO INVOKE THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE / CANCELLATION OF SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE / MEDIATION - DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERVICE OF PROCESS - BY CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER STATE OF FLORIDA - STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (NOTICE OF FILING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$65.00; Amount Paid:$65.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2018084194

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 09/25/2018 AT 10:30 AM IN 5C , JDG: DENKIN, DAVID LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED - STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less