This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 05/03/2023 at 01:15:34 (UTC).

FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF FINANCIAL SERVICES Et Al VS ALINARI CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/18/2023 FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF FINANCIAL SERVICES filed an Other lawsuit against ALINARI CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARROLL, HUNTER W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7 NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARROLL, HUNTER W

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF FINANCIAL SERVICES

ST JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY INC

Defendants

TUDI MECHANICAL SYSTEMS OF TAMPA INC

ALINARI CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROWN, MATTHEW

Defendant Attorneys

KRONE, MICHELLE

EDMOND, REGINALD

 

Court Documents

ORDER SETTING TRIAL

3/10/2023: ORDER SETTING TRIAL

ORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT

3/10/2023: ORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

3/9/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE - SERVING INTERROGATORIES

3/9/2023: NOTICE - SERVING INTERROGATORIES

REPORT - AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT

3/8/2023: REPORT - AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT

ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - TUDI MECHANICAL SYSTEMS OF TAMPA INC

2/17/2023: ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - TUDI MECHANICAL SYSTEMS OF TAMPA INC

ANSWER - AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - ALINARI CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

2/16/2023: ANSWER - AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - ALINARI CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DISCLOSURE WITHOUT WAIVING SERVICE O FPROCESS

2/15/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DISCLOSURE WITHOUT WAIVING SERVICE O FPROCESS

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

2/15/2023: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2024
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 6C; Description: JURY TRIAL - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2024
  • HearingTime: 08:45 AM; Location: COURTROOM 6C; Description: MANDATORY DOCKET SOUNDING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2024
  • HearingTime: 09:45 AM; Location: COURTROOM 6C; Description: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - CIRCUIT COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • HearingTime: 02:30 PM; Location: COURTROOM 6C; Description: CASE MANAGEMENT; Court Result: CANCELLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - TO TUDI MECHANICAL SYSTEMS OF TAMPA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO TUDI MECHANICAL SYSTEMS OF TAMPA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - FOR EXTENSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIST - WITNESS, EXHIBIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIST - WITNESS AND EXHIBIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIST - PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL FACT WITNESS AND EXHIBIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $420.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $420.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT; Total Fee: $400.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - TUDI MECHANICAL SYSTEMS OF TAMPA INC - ISSUED 1/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ALINARI CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC - ISSUED 1/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less