This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/15/2020 at 13:00:19 (UTC).

FIRST PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH OF NORTH PORT FLORIDA VS NEW HOPE COMMUNITY CHURCH OF NORTH PORT AN AFFILIATED CHURCH OT THE CHRISTIAND AND MISSIONARY ALLIANCE INC

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 FIRST PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH OF NORTH PORT FLORIDA filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against NEW HOPE COMMUNITY CHURCH OF NORTH PORT AN AFFILIATED CHURCH OT THE CHRISTIAND AND MISSIONARY ALLIANCE INC. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON and RUHL, MARIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 SC

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON

RUHL, MARIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRST PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH OF NORTH PORT FLORIDA

Defendant

NEW HOPE COMMUNITY CHURCH OF NORTH PORT AN AFFILIATED CHURCH OT THE CHRISTIAND AND MISSIONARY ALLIANCE INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CASTRO, SARA

Defendant Attorney

SIEGEL, GLENN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE - OF SERVICE TO ANSWERS FIRST SET OF EXPERT INTERROGATORIES

8/12/2019: NOTICE - OF SERVICE TO ANSWERS FIRST SET OF EXPERT INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE - INTERROGATORIES

6/21/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE - INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - AMENDED

1/30/2019: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - AMENDED

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

1/29/2019: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

OBJECTION AND RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

10/19/2018: OBJECTION AND RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE - SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

10/16/2018: NOTICE - SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

9/24/2018: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE - SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

9/18/2018: NOTICE - SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

9/18/2018: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2017095738

10/11/2017: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2017095738

PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2017095733

10/11/2017: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2017095733

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - AS TO AMENDED COMPLAINT - NEW HOPE COMMUNITY CHURCH OF NORTH PORT AN AFFILIATED CHURCH OF THE CHRISTIAN AND MISSIONARY ALLIANCE INC - ISSUED 10/11/2017

10/11/2017: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - AS TO AMENDED COMPLAINT - NEW HOPE COMMUNITY CHURCH OF NORTH PORT AN AFFILIATED CHURCH OF THE CHRISTIAN AND MISSIONARY ALLIANCE INC - ISSUED 10/11/2017

SUMMONS- PROPOSED - AS TO AMENDED COMPLAINT - NEW HOPE COMMUNITY CHURCH OF NORTH PORT AN AFFILIATED CHURCH OF THE CHRISTIAN AND MISSIONARY ALLIANCE INC -- NOT ISSUED -- INCORRECT CLERK LISTED ON SIGNATURE BLOCK

10/11/2017: SUMMONS- PROPOSED - AS TO AMENDED COMPLAINT - NEW HOPE COMMUNITY CHURCH OF NORTH PORT AN AFFILIATED CHURCH OF THE CHRISTIAN AND MISSIONARY ALLIANCE INC -- NOT ISSUED -- INCORRECT CLERK LISTED ON SIGNATURE BLOCK

COMPLAINT - FIRST AMENDED

10/11/2017: COMPLAINT - FIRST AMENDED

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2017091221

9/27/2017: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2017091221

SUMMONS- PROPOSED-UNABLE TO ISSUE-DOES NOT MATCH CASE STYLE

9/27/2017: SUMMONS- PROPOSED-UNABLE TO ISSUE-DOES NOT MATCH CASE STYLE

COMPLAINT

9/27/2017: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/27/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OF SERVICE TO ANSWERS FIRST SET OF EXPERT INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE - INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION AND RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE - AMENDED DEFENSES TO AMENDED COMPLAINT - FIRST PRESBYTERIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2017095738

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2017095733

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - AS TO AMENDED COMPLAINT - NEW HOPE COMMUNITY CHURCH OF NORTH PORT AN AFFILIATED CHURCH OF THE CHRISTIAN AND MISSIONARY ALLIANCE INC - ISSUED 10/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED - AS TO AMENDED COMPLAINT - NEW HOPE COMMUNITY CHURCH OF NORTH PORT AN AFFILIATED CHURCH OF THE CHRISTIAN AND MISSIONARY ALLIANCE INC -- NOT ISSUED -- INCORRECT CLERK LISTED ON SIGNATURE BLOCK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - FIRST AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$430.00; Amount Paid:$430.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2017091221

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED-UNABLE TO ISSUE-DOES NOT MATCH CASE STYLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less