This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/29/2021 at 00:45:22 (UTC).

FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF OMAHA VS LERMAN, DONNA E

Case Summary

On 02/05/2014 FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF OMAHA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LERMAN, DONNA E. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DENKIN, DAVID LEE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 NC

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DENKIN, DAVID LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF OMAHA

Defendant

LERMAN, DONNA E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAVRAR, FLYNN

 

Court Documents

ANSWER

3/13/2014: ANSWER

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

7/13/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MIITARY STATUS AFFIDAVIT

10/1/2014: MIITARY STATUS AFFIDAVIT

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

9/8/2014: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - DONNA E LERMAN- ISSUED 2/5/2014

2/5/2014: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - DONNA E LERMAN- ISSUED 2/5/2014

CIVIL COVER SHEET

2/5/2014: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF FILING - SUPPORTING AFFIDAVIT

4/23/2014: NOTICE OF FILING - SUPPORTING AFFIDAVIT

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

2/5/2014: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

JUDGMENT - FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2014126988)

10/23/2014: JUDGMENT - FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2014126988)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2014126988)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • DocketACTION: PROPOSED FINAL JUDGEMENT TO JUDGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMIITARY STATUS AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF TAXABLE COSTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • HearingTime:09:15 AM; Location:COURTROOM 7B; Description:MOTIONS ;Court Result:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED- DONNA E LERMAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$310.00; Amount Paid:$310.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2014014165

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - DONNA E LERMAN- ISSUED 2/5/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/05/2014 CASE NUMBER 2014 CC 000690 NC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where First National Bank of Omaha is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LaVrar, Flynn, ESQ.