This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/29/2022 at 05:20:39 (UTC).

FIRST FRANKLIN MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST MORTGAGE LOAN ASSETBACKED CERTIFICATES SERIES 2007-FFC US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BANK OF AMERICA NA AS TRUSTEE SUCCESSOR BY MANAGER TO LASALLE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUS

Case Summary

On 12/09/2021 FIRST FRANKLIN MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST MORTGAGE LOAN ASSETBACKED CERTIFICATES SERIES 2007-FFC US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BANK OF AMERICA NA AS TRUSTEE SUCCESSOR BY MANAGER TO LASALLE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUS was filed as a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WALKER, STEPHEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 NC

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WALKER, STEPHEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRST FRANKLIN MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST MORTGAGE LOAN ASSETBACKED CERTIFICATES SERIES 2007-FFC US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BANK OF AMERICA NA AS TRUSTEE SUCCESSOR BY MANAGER TO LASALLE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUS

Defendants

KAMKE, MARIA A

KAMKE, MARIA

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MARIA A KAMKE

CRYSTAL LAKES ASSOCIATION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLLINS, SARA

Defendant Attorneys

GREGG MARTIN HOROWITZ

HICKS, JENNIFER

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY FILED AND RECORDED - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MARIA A KAMKE A/K/A MARIA KAMKE - UNKNOWN TENANT 1 IN POSSESSION AND UNKNOWN TENANT 2 IN POSSESSION - Recorded (OR. / 2022013382)

1/25/2022: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY FILED AND RECORDED - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MARIA A KAMKE A/K/A MARIA KAMKE - UNKNOWN TENANT 1 IN POSSESSION AND UNKNOWN TENANT 2 IN POSSESSION - Recorded (OR. / 2022013382)

RESPONSE - MOTION TO STAY

1/21/2022: RESPONSE - MOTION TO STAY

SUMMONS SERVED - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MARIA A KAMKE A/K/A MARIA KAMKE

1/13/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MARIA A KAMKE A/K/A MARIA KAMKE

SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

1/12/2022: SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

1/12/2022: SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

SUMMONS SERVED - CRYSTAL LAKES ASSOCIATION, INC.

1/12/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - CRYSTAL LAKES ASSOCIATION, INC.

SUMMONS SERVED - MARIA A KAMKE A/K/A MARIA KAMKE

1/12/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - MARIA A KAMKE A/K/A MARIA KAMKE

RESPONSE - TO DEMAND FOR VERIFICATION OF DEBT

1/10/2022: RESPONSE - TO DEMAND FOR VERIFICATION OF DEBT

ANSWER - AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - CRYSTAL LAKES ASSOCIATION INC

1/5/2022: ANSWER - AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - CRYSTAL LAKES ASSOCIATION INC

RESPONSE - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

9/22/2022: RESPONSE - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF FILING - EMAIL COMMUNICATIONS

9/20/2022: NOTICE OF FILING - EMAIL COMMUNICATIONS

RESPONSE - AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

8/17/2022: RESPONSE - AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

RESPONSE - IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENT PRODUCTION & SANCTIONS

8/11/2022: RESPONSE - IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENT PRODUCTION & SANCTIONS

ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE

8/4/2022: ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE

NOTICE OF HEARING

8/2/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

ANSWER - MARIA KAMKE

8/1/2022: ANSWER - MARIA KAMKE

MOTION - COMPEL DOCUMENT PRODUCTION & SANCTIONS

7/26/2022: MOTION - COMPEL DOCUMENT PRODUCTION & SANCTIONS

ORDER - ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY

6/21/2022: ORDER - ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2022
  • HearingTime: 10:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM ZOOM; Description: MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - EMAIL COMMUNICATIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Sep 27 2022 10:00AM JUDGE: BAILEY, DEBORAH LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE - AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE - IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENT PRODUCTION & SANCTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Sep 27 2022 10:00AM JUDGE: BAILEY, DEBORAH LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER - MARIA KAMKE

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - CRYSTAL LAKES ASSOCIATION INC - CO ALL FLORIDA SERVICES MANAGEMENT - - ISSUED 12/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VALUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE FORM B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE FORM A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2021220814)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FORECLS >$50,000-249,999.99

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CRYSTAL LAKES ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where FIRST FRANKLIN MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST MORTGAGE LOAN ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES SERIES 2007 FFC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HICKS, JENNIFER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREGG MARTIN HOROWITZ