This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/21/2023 at 15:07:38 (UTC).

FINLEY, WILLIAM Et Al VS ANDERSON, GREG A Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/14/2022 FINLEY, WILLIAM filed an Other lawsuit against ANDERSON, GREG A. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WALKER, STEPHEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 NC

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WALKER, STEPHEN

 

Party Details

Petitioners

FRASCONE, THOMAS

FRASCONE, ILEANA

FINLEY, WILLIAM

SUTTON, NANCY

Respondents

CITY OF SARASOTA FLORIDA

CITY OF SARASOTA BOARD OF ADJUSTMENT

ANDERSON, GREG A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GUARNIERI, DANIEL

Respondent Attorney

LESSINGER, JASON ALAN

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE - TO MOTION TO DISMISS

9/20/2022: RESPONSE - TO MOTION TO DISMISS

ORDER

9/15/2022: ORDER

ORDER

9/13/2022: ORDER

ORDER - TO SHOW CAUSE

9/8/2022: ORDER - TO SHOW CAUSE

MOTION - FOR EXPEDITED STATUS CONFERENCE AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED HEARING - EFILED AND ACCEPTED INTO INCORRECT CASE

9/1/2022: MOTION - FOR EXPEDITED STATUS CONFERENCE AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED HEARING - EFILED AND ACCEPTED INTO INCORRECT CASE

MOTION - TO DISMISS

9/1/2022: MOTION - TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES

9/1/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES

APPENDIX

7/14/2022: APPENDIX

PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2022062458

7/14/2022: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2022062458

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE - TO RESPONDENT'S RESPONSES TO PETITION FOR CERTIORARI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPENDIX

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE - IN OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE - TO PETITION FOR CERTIORARI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - EXTENSION OF TIME

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLY WITH COURT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - ON MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLY WITH COURT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLY WITH COURT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE - TO MOTION TO DISMISS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - TO SHOW CAUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - FOR EXPEDITED STATUS CONFERENCE AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED HEARING - EFILED AND ACCEPTED INTO INCORRECT CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - TO DISMISS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $400.00; Amount Paid: $400.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: PETITION - CIRCUIT; Total Fee: $400.00; Amount Paid: $400.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2022062458

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketACTION: PETITION FORWARDED TO JUDGES OFFICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION - CIRCUIT - WRIT OF CERTIORARI FOR REVIEW OF QUASI-JUDICAL ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPENDIX

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less