Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 01/06/2021 at 14:55:57 (UTC).

FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION FANNIE MAE A CORPORATION ORGANIZED AND EXISTING UNDER THE LAWS OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA VS ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PARTIES Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION FANNIE MAE A CORPORATION ORGANIZED AND EXISTING UNDER THE LAWS OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PARTIES. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MERCURIO, FREDERICK P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************9 NC

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MERCURIO, FREDERICK P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION FANNIE MAE A CORPORATION ORGANIZED AND EXISTING UNDER THE LAWS OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Defendants

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CURTIS EDWARD TRASCHER

ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PARTIES

TRASCHER, CLAUDINE S

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CLAUDINE SHIRLEY TRASCHER

UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESSION #1

TRASCHER, CURTIS EDWARD

SADDLE CREEK OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

TRASCHER, CLAUDINE SHIRLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COHN, RICHARD PAUL

Defendant Attorneys

RIDDELL, CYNTHIA

ROWE, MICHELLE

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE - TO MOTION TO DISMISS

1/24/2018: RESPONSE - TO MOTION TO DISMISS

FORECLOSURE - FINAL JUDGMENT PROPOSED

12/7/2017: FORECLOSURE - FINAL JUDGMENT PROPOSED

MOTION - SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

10/24/2017: MOTION - SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT OF COST

10/24/2017: AFFIDAVIT OF COST

DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

4/17/2017: DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

SUMMONS NON SERVED - CLAUDINE SHIRLEY TRASCHER AKA CLAUDINE S TRASCHER

3/31/2017: SUMMONS NON SERVED - CLAUDINE SHIRLEY TRASCHER AKA CLAUDINE S TRASCHER

SUMMONS SERVED - UNKNOWN TENANT(S) IN POSSESSION #1

3/31/2017: SUMMONS SERVED - UNKNOWN TENANT(S) IN POSSESSION #1

SUMMONS- PROPOSED- UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESSION #1

2/6/2017: SUMMONS- PROPOSED- UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESSION #1

LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2017015189)

2/6/2017: LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2017015189)

ORDER OF DISMISSAL DISCHARGE LIS PENDENS AND RETURN ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018012592)

1/30/2018: ORDER OF DISMISSAL DISCHARGE LIS PENDENS AND RETURN ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018012592)

CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY

7/17/2017: CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY

AMENDED NOTICE OF MEDIATION

7/13/2017: AMENDED NOTICE OF MEDIATION

MEDIATION ORDER

6/22/2017: MEDIATION ORDER

PAYMENT $0.00 RECEIPT #2017047955

5/17/2017: PAYMENT $0.00 RECEIPT #2017047955

SUMMONS SERVED - CURTIS EDWARD TRASCHER

3/31/2017: SUMMONS SERVED - CURTIS EDWARD TRASCHER

DESIGNATION BY THE LAW OFFICES OF LOBECK & HANSON PA OF EMAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516 OF THE FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

3/24/2017: DESIGNATION BY THE LAW OFFICES OF LOBECK & HANSON PA OF EMAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516 OF THE FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

SUMMONS- PROPOSED- SADDLE CREEK OWNERS ASSOCATION INC

2/6/2017: SUMMONS- PROPOSED- SADDLE CREEK OWNERS ASSOCATION INC

CIVIL COVER SHEET

2/6/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2018
  • HearingTime:10:30 AM; Location:COURTROOM 7C; Description:MOTIONS ;Court Result:CANCELLED BY JACS INTERFACE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL DISCHARGE LIS PENDENS AND RETURN ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018012592)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE - TO MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • HearingTime:11:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 7C; Description:MOTIONS ;Court Result:CANCELLED BY JACS INTERFACE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - EX-PARTE TO DISMISS CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • Docket*** CANCELLED - COURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Feb 14 2018 10:30AM JUDGE: MERCURIO, FREDERICK P LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION - HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Feb 14 2018 10:30AM JUDGE: MERCURIO, FREDERICK P LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $1,945.00 RECEIPT #2017011954

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS NOT ISSUED DUE TO MISSING FORM A AND/OR B PURSUANT TO 12TH CIRCUIT AO 2012-9.1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED- UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESSION #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED- SADDLE CREEK OWNERS ASSOCATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED- CURTIS EDWARD TRASHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED- CLAUDINE SHIRLEY TRASCHER AKA CLAUDINE S TRASHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2017015189)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- VALUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FORECLSE >$250,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SADDLE CREEK OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Federal National Mortgage Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RIDDELL, CYNTHIA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROWE, MICHELLE