This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 01/25/2022 at 01:46:29 (UTC).

FAIRCHILD, JOYCE VS BOLAND, JOHN Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/18/2021 FAIRCHILD, JOYCE filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against BOLAND, JOHN. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WALKER, STEPHEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 NC

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WALKER, STEPHEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FAIRCHILD, JOYCE

Defendants

BOLAND, JOHN

BOLAND, MILDRED

BOLAND, MILDRED R

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

TENANT 1

TENANT 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MASSEY, STARLETT

CODDING, JENNIFER

Defendant Attorney

EISEMANN, DEREK

 

Court Documents

ORDER - REJECTING PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

1/19/2022: ORDER - REJECTING PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

REPORT - CASE MANAGEMENT

1/11/2022: REPORT - CASE MANAGEMENT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

12/27/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

MOTION - EXTENSION OF TIME

12/27/2021: MOTION - EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

12/20/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

CERTIFICATE - COMPLIANCE WITH AND SERVICE OF CIRCUIT CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGMENT HEARING

12/16/2021: CERTIFICATE - COMPLIANCE WITH AND SERVICE OF CIRCUIT CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGMENT HEARING

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY FILED AND RECORDED - TENANT #1 AND TENANT #2 - Recorded (OR. / 2021232230)

12/16/2021: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY FILED AND RECORDED - TENANT #1 AND TENANT #2 - Recorded (OR. / 2021232230)

NOTICE - SUMMONS PREVIOUSLY ISSUED - TENANT #2

12/15/2021: NOTICE - SUMMONS PREVIOUSLY ISSUED - TENANT #2

NOTICE - SUMMONS PREVIOUSLY ISSUED - TENANT #1

12/15/2021: NOTICE - SUMMONS PREVIOUSLY ISSUED - TENANT #1

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/18/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2021208896)

11/17/2021: LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2021208896)

CERTIFICATE- OF LOCATION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

11/17/2021: CERTIFICATE- OF LOCATION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

EXHIBIT- PLAINTIFF LENDERS CONTACT INFORMATION

11/17/2021: EXHIBIT- PLAINTIFF LENDERS CONTACT INFORMATION

NOTICE- VALUE

11/17/2021: NOTICE- VALUE

CERTIFICATE- OF NOTICE TO TENANTS

11/17/2021: CERTIFICATE- OF NOTICE TO TENANTS

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

11/17/2021: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

COMPLAINT FORECLS $50,000 OR LESS

11/17/2021: COMPLAINT FORECLS $50,000 OR LESS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/17/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2022
  • HearingTime:01:30 PM; Location:COURTROOM 7C; Description:CASE MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - REJECTING PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPORT - CASE MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE - COMPLIANCE WITH AND SERVICE OF CIRCUIT CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGMENT HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY FILED AND RECORDED - TENANT #1 AND TENANT #2 - Recorded (OR. / 2021232230)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SUMMONS PREVIOUSLY ISSUED - TENANT #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SUMMONS PREVIOUSLY ISSUED - TENANT #1

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - JOHN BOLAND - ISSUED 11/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2021208896)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE- OF LOCATION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT- PLAINTIFF LENDERS CONTACT INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- VALUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE- OF NOTICE TO TENANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FORECLS $50,000 OR LESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Unite States of America Dept of Treasury is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EISEMANN, DEREK WILLIAM