Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 01/06/2021 at 17:11:34 (UTC).

E*TRADE BANK VS BANK OF AMERICA NA Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/14/2017 E TRADE BANK filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against BANK OF AMERICA NA. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MCHUGH, ANDREA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 NC

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MCHUGH, ANDREA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

E*TRADE BANK

Defendants

COMERFORD, KATHLEEN

UNKNOWN HEIRS OF KATHLEEN COMERFORD AKA K COMERFORD

K. COMERFORD

BANK OF AMERICA NA

UNKNOWN TENANT 2 IN POSSESSION OF SUBJECT PROPERTY

COMERFORD, K

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KATHLEEN COMERFORD A/K/A K COMERFORD N/K/A EDWARD CRUZ

UNKNOWN TENANT 1 IN POSSESSION OF SUBJECT PROPERTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VAN NESS, J

Defendant Attorneys

YOUNG, JEFFREY

KNIGHT, JOSHUA

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

4/25/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING

CERTIFICATE OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY

7/3/2017: CERTIFICATE OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY

NOTICE OF DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

6/16/2017: NOTICE OF DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

PLAINITFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING DISCOVERY RESPONSES

6/1/2017: PLAINITFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING DISCOVERY RESPONSES

AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY'S FEE

3/24/2017: AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY'S FEE

AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY STATUS

3/24/2017: AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY STATUS

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

3/13/2017: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

SUMMONS SERVED-KATHLEEN COMERFORD A/K/A K. COMERFORD

3/3/2017: SUMMONS SERVED-KATHLEEN COMERFORD A/K/A K. COMERFORD

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-UNKNOWN TENANT #2 IN POSSESSION OF SUBJECT PROPERTY- ISSUED 2/14/2017

2/14/2017: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-UNKNOWN TENANT #2 IN POSSESSION OF SUBJECT PROPERTY- ISSUED 2/14/2017

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

12/18/2018: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

AFFIDAVIT - AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL - TIME & EFFORT

2/28/2018: AFFIDAVIT - AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL - TIME & EFFORT

NOTICE OF FILING - AMENDED AFFIDAVITS (NOT ATTACHED)

2/28/2018: NOTICE OF FILING - AMENDED AFFIDAVITS (NOT ATTACHED)

NOTICE OF TERMINATION OF MEDIATION STAY

7/11/2017: NOTICE OF TERMINATION OF MEDIATION STAY

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

7/10/2017: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ON BEHALF OF BANK OF AMERICA NA

4/11/2017: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ON BEHALF OF BANK OF AMERICA NA

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KATHLEEN COMERFORD A/K/A K COMERFORD N/K/A EDWARD CRUZ AND BANK OF AMERICA NA

3/24/2017: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KATHLEEN COMERFORD A/K/A K COMERFORD N/K/A EDWARD CRUZ AND BANK OF AMERICA NA

SUMMONS SERVED-BNK OF AMERICA, NA--CORPORATE SERVICE

3/3/2017: SUMMONS SERVED-BNK OF AMERICA, NA--CORPORATE SERVICE

NOTICE OF VALUE

2/14/2017: NOTICE OF VALUE

65 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL FILED AND RECORDED - DISSOLVE LIS PENDENS - RELEASE ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS - Recorded (OR. / 2018166985)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM VAN NESS LAW FIRM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - DISMISS ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE- MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • HearingTime:10:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 6C; Description:MOTIONS ;Court Result:CANCELLED BY JACS INTERFACE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION - HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Docket*** CANCELLED - COURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Jun 27 2018 10:00AM JUDGE: MCHUGH, ANDREA LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KATHLEEN COMERFORD AKA K COMERFORD- ISSUED 2/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-KATHLEEN COMERFORD AKA K COMERFORD- ISSUED 2/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-BANK OF AMERICA NA- ISSUED 2/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE-FORECLOURE FORM B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATION-FORECLOSURE FORM A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VALUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF OWNERSHIP OF INSTRUMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2017018523)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FORECLSE >$250,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where E*TRADE BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YOUNG, JEFFREY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOSHUA KNIGHT