This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 11/27/2021 at 18:01:20 (UTC).

ESTATE OF LEON E KNORPS Et Al VS DOOR CONTROLS INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/28/2021 ESTATE OF LEON E KNORPS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DOOR CONTROLS INC. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WALKER, STEPHEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7 NC

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WALKER, STEPHEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ESTATE OF LEON E KNORPS

KNORPS, ELAINE

Defendants

VCS STORE # 3258

HOLIDAY CVS LLC

DORMAKABA USA INC

DOOR CONTROLS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAPIRO, M

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/28/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/28/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- HOLIDAY CVS LLC DBA CVS STORE # 3258

9/28/2021: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- HOLIDAY CVS LLC DBA CVS STORE # 3258

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- DORMAKABA USA INC DBA DOOR CONTROLS INC

9/28/2021: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- DORMAKABA USA INC DBA DOOR CONTROLS INC

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

9/28/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

9/28/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

9/28/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE-- OF INTERROGATORIES

9/28/2021: NOTICE-- OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE- OF INTERROGATORIES

9/28/2021: NOTICE- OF INTERROGATORIES

PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2021082901

9/28/2021: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2021082901

COMPLAINT- FOR DAMAGES

9/28/2021: COMPLAINT- FOR DAMAGES

SUMMONS SERVED - HOLIDAY CVS, LLC D\B\A CVS STORE

10/18/2021: SUMMONS SERVED - HOLIDAY CVS, LLC D\B\A CVS STORE

SUMMONS SERVED - HOLIDAY CVS LLC DBA CVS STORES 3258

10/19/2021: SUMMONS SERVED - HOLIDAY CVS LLC DBA CVS STORES 3258

SUMMONS SERVED - DOMAKABA USA INC D/B/A DOOR CONTROLS INC

10/20/2021: SUMMONS SERVED - DOMAKABA USA INC D/B/A DOOR CONTROLS INC

SUMMONS SERVED - DORMAKABA USA INC D/B/A DOOR CONTROLS INC

10/20/2021: SUMMONS SERVED - DORMAKABA USA INC D/B/A DOOR CONTROLS INC

ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

10/27/2021: ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2022
  • HearingTime:01:30 PM; Location:COURTROOM 7C; Description:CASE MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 02/22/2022 AT 1:30 PM IN 7C , JDG: WALKER, STEPHEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - DORMAKABA USA INC D/B/A DOOR CONTROLS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - DOMAKABA USA INC D/B/A DOOR CONTROLS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - HOLIDAY CVS LLC DBA CVS STORES 3258

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - HOLIDAY CVS, LLC D\B\A CVS STORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$400.00; Amount Paid:$400.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2021082901

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE-- OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT- FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- DORMAKABA USA INC DBA DOOR CONTROLS INC - ISSUED 10/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- HOLIDAY CVS LLC DBA CVS STORE # 3258 - ISSUED 10/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DORMA USA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Holiday CVS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAPIRO, M