This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/16/2020 at 03:02:54 (UTC).

ESTATE OF BIRDIE P OLSON BY AND THROUGH WILLIAM PERKINS AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE VS BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING COMMUNITIES INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/13/2018 ESTATE OF BIRDIE P OLSON BY AND THROUGH WILLIAM PERKINS AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE filed an Other lawsuit against BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING COMMUNITIES INC. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON and RUHL, MARIA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 SC

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON

RUHL, MARIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESTATE OF BIRDIE P OLSON BY AND THROUGH WILLIAM PERKINS AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

Defendants

BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING INC

BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING COMMUNITIES INC

WEBER, KURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KEIM, JAMES

Defendant Attorneys

LOSSIUS, RYAN

RIVERO, MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

1/10/2020: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC

1/7/2020: CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC

ORDER OF DISMISSAL AND DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE FILE - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2020002607)

1/7/2020: ORDER OF DISMISSAL AND DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE FILE - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2020002607)

STIPULATION - JOINT FOR DISMISSAL

1/3/2020: STIPULATION - JOINT FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL - AMENDED

4/25/2019: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL - AMENDED

ORDER - ADOPTING RECOMMENDED ORDER - ON AMENDED MOTION DISMISS AND COMPEL ARBITRATION AND MOTION STAY

4/24/2019: ORDER - ADOPTING RECOMMENDED ORDER - ON AMENDED MOTION DISMISS AND COMPEL ARBITRATION AND MOTION STAY

RECOMMENDED ORDER OF MAGISTRATE - ON AMENDED MOTION TO DISMISS AND COMPEL ARBITRATION AND MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

4/5/2019: RECOMMENDED ORDER OF MAGISTRATE - ON AMENDED MOTION TO DISMISS AND COMPEL ARBITRATION AND MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

EVIDENCE RECORD - PLAINTIFF #43309

4/5/2019: EVIDENCE RECORD - PLAINTIFF #43309

RECEIPT - EVIDENCE TRANSFER

4/5/2019: RECEIPT - EVIDENCE TRANSFER

CERTIFICATE OF MEDIATION AUTHORITY

4/4/2018: CERTIFICATE OF MEDIATION AUTHORITY

NOTICE OF MEDIATION

2/20/2018: NOTICE OF MEDIATION

PAYMENT $430.00 RECEIPT #2018015067

2/13/2018: PAYMENT $430.00 RECEIPT #2018015067

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-KURT WEBER - ISSUED 02/13/2018

2/13/2018: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-KURT WEBER - ISSUED 02/13/2018

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING INC - ISSUED 02/13/2018

2/13/2018: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING INC - ISSUED 02/13/2018

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING COMMUNITIES INC - ISSUED 02/13/2018

2/13/2018: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING COMMUNITIES INC - ISSUED 02/13/2018

COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL(SOUTH COUNTY)

2/13/2018: COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL(SOUTH COUNTY)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

2/13/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

2/13/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET

81 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL AND DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE FILE - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2020002607)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - JOINT FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL - AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - ADOPTING RECOMMENDED ORDER - ON AMENDED MOTION DISMISS AND COMPEL ARBITRATION AND MOTION STAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECOMMENDED ORDER OF MAGISTRATE - ON AMENDED MOTION TO DISMISS AND COMPEL ARBITRATION AND MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVIDENCE RECORD - PLAINTIFF #43309

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT - EVIDENCE TRANSFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
86 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MEDIATION AUTHORITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$430.00; Amount Paid:$430.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $430.00 RECEIPT #2018015067

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-KURT WEBER - ISSUED 02/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING INC - ISSUED 02/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING COMMUNITIES INC - ISSUED 02/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL(SOUTH COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less