This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 01/21/2022 at 20:32:43 (UTC).

ESPOSITO, BARBARA VS CAMPELLONE, MARK ALAN

Case Summary

On 05/07/2021 ESPOSITO, BARBARA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CAMPELLONE, MARK ALAN. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WALKER, STEPHEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 NC

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WALKER, STEPHEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESPOSITO, BARBARA

Defendant

CAMPELLONE, MARK ALAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DANNHEISSER, BERTRAM V III

Defendant Attorney

GELMAN, BRETT

 

Court Documents

ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE - FOR DISCOVERY PURPOSES ONLY

5/28/2021: ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE - FOR DISCOVERY PURPOSES ONLY

ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - MARK CAMPELLONE

6/9/2021: ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - MARK CAMPELLONE

NOTICE - OF DISCLOSURE

6/9/2021: NOTICE - OF DISCLOSURE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF SERVICE EMAIL ADDRESS

6/9/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF SERVICE EMAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE - PLAINTIFF'S

6/28/2021: NOTICE - PLAINTIFF'S

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

6/22/2021: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

COMPLAINT

5/7/2021: COMPLAINT

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021040239

5/7/2021: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021040239

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

6/9/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

1/20/2022: STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

NOTICE - SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

1/18/2022: NOTICE - SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION

1/13/2022: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

11/8/2021: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

ORDER SETTING TRIAL

10/18/2021: ORDER SETTING TRIAL

ORDER SETTING TRIAL

10/18/2021: ORDER SETTING TRIAL

ORDER FOR CASE MANAGEMENT

10/18/2021: ORDER FOR CASE MANAGEMENT

RESPONSE - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

10/12/2021: RESPONSE - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE - SERVICE OF DEFENDANT ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

10/12/2021: NOTICE - SERVICE OF DEFENDANT ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2022
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 7C; Description:JURY TRIAL - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 7C; Description:MANDATORY DOCKET SOUNDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • HearingTime:10:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 7C; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - CIRCUIT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketJURY TRIAL - CIVIL SET FOR 10/10/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN 7C , JDG: WALKER, STEPHEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketMANDATORY DOCKET SOUNDING SET FOR 10/03/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN 7C , JDG: WALKER, STEPHEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - CIRCUIT COURT SET FOR 09/12/2022 AT 10:00 AM IN 7C , JDG: WALKER, STEPHEN

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO CONSOLIDATE - FOR DISCOVERY PURPOSES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - MARK ALAN CAMPELLONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$410.00; Amount Paid:$410.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021040239

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - MARK ALAN CAMPELLONE - ISSUED 5/10/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GELMAN, BRETT