This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 09/23/2022 at 18:04:06 (UTC).

EQUITY TRUST COMPANY VS CITY OF NORTH PORT FLORIDA Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/25/2022 EQUITY TRUST COMPANY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against CITY OF NORTH PORT FLORIDA. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRUNING, KEVIN R and CARROLL, HUNTER W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7 SC

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

CARROLL, HUNTER W

BRUNING, KEVIN R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EQUITY TRUST COMPANY

Defendants

SARASOTA COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR

CITY OF NORTH PORT FLORIDA

ONE BLUE SKY INVESTMENTS LLC

JOCKEY CLUB OF NORTH PORT PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEVENS, ADAM

Defendant Attorneys

GOLEN, MICHAEL

SLAYTON, AMBER

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

7/25/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

ORDER TO TRANSFER FILE - DIVISION H

8/1/2022: ORDER TO TRANSFER FILE - DIVISION H

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- SARASOTA COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR - ISSUED 7/26/2022

7/25/2022: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- SARASOTA COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR - ISSUED 7/26/2022

PAYMENT $430.00 RECEIPT #2022065704

7/25/2022: PAYMENT $430.00 RECEIPT #2022065704

COMPLAINT- FOR QUIET TITLE

7/25/2022: COMPLAINT- FOR QUIET TITLE

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- JOCKEY CLUB OF NORTH PORT PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC - ISSUED 7/26/2022

7/25/2022: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- JOCKEY CLUB OF NORTH PORT PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC - ISSUED 7/26/2022

ORDER - STREAMLINED CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

8/1/2022: ORDER - STREAMLINED CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- CITY OF NORTH PORT FLORIDA - ISSUED 7/26/2022

7/25/2022: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- CITY OF NORTH PORT FLORIDA - ISSUED 7/26/2022

NOTICE OF ACTION - ONE BLUE SKY INVESTMENTS LLC

8/29/2022: NOTICE OF ACTION - ONE BLUE SKY INVESTMENTS LLC

DEFAULT - SARASOTA COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR AND JOCKEY CLUB OF NORTH PORT PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

8/29/2022: DEFAULT - SARASOTA COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR AND JOCKEY CLUB OF NORTH PORT PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - SARASOTA COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR

8/26/2022: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - SARASOTA COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR

SUMMONS SERVED - SARASOTA COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR

8/26/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - SARASOTA COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR

NOTICE OF ACTION - PROPOSED

8/26/2022: NOTICE OF ACTION - PROPOSED

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

8/26/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - JOCKEY CLUB OF NORTH PORT PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

8/26/2022: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - JOCKEY CLUB OF NORTH PORT PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - SARASOTA COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR

8/18/2022: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - SARASOTA COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR

ANSWER - NORTH PORT FLORIDA

8/11/2022: ANSWER - NORTH PORT FLORIDA

SUMMONS SERVED - JOCKEY CLUB OF NORTH PORT PROPERTY OWNER'S ASSOCIATION INC

8/8/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - JOCKEY CLUB OF NORTH PORT PROPERTY OWNER'S ASSOCIATION INC

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2022
  • HearingTime: 01:30 PM; Location: COURTROOM D; Description: CASE MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketACTION:NOTICE OF ACTION SENT TO NEWSPAPER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION - ONE BLUE SKY INVESTMENTS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT - SARASOTA COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR AND JOCKEY CLUB OF NORTH PORT PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - SARASOTA COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - SARASOTA COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION - PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - JOCKEY CLUB OF NORTH PORT PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketACTION: CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE DEFAULT - SARASOTA COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR - NO PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT REAL PROP $50,000 OR LESS; Total Fee: $400.00; Amount Paid: $400.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $430.00 RECEIPT #2022065704

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- SARASOTA COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR - ISSUED 7/26/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- JOCKEY CLUB OF NORTH PORT PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC - ISSUED 7/26/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- CITY OF NORTH PORT FLORIDA - ISSUED 7/26/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT REAL PROP $50,000 OR LESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SARASOTA COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR is a litigant

Latest cases where EQUITY TRUST CO is a litigant

Latest cases where JOCKEY CLUB OF NORTH PORT PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where THE CITY OF NORTH PORT, FLORIDA is a litigant