This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 03/18/2021 at 19:24:20 (UTC).

EQUITY TRUST COMPANY VS AMERICAN ESTATE AND TRUST Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/20/2019 EQUITY TRUST COMPANY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against AMERICAN ESTATE AND TRUST. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALKER, STEPHEN and RUHL, MARIA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 SC

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALKER, STEPHEN

RUHL, MARIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EQUITY TRUST COMPANY

Defendants

AMERICAN ESTATE AND TRUST

VEOVICH, EDWARD A

SA IMMOBILIERE LAFAYETTE

FIFTH THIRD MORTGAGE

AMERICAN ESTATE AND TRUST FBO WILLIAM WEAVER IRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TISEO, ALBERT

Defendant Attorney

POLICASTRO, DANIEL

 

Court Documents

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

4/14/2020: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - ALBERT J TISEO JR

4/8/2020: CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - ALBERT J TISEO JR

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

4/8/2020: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - AMERICAN ESTATE AND TRUST FBO WILLIAM WEVER IRA AND FIFTH THIRD MORTGAGE

2/20/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - AMERICAN ESTATE AND TRUST FBO WILLIAM WEVER IRA AND FIFTH THIRD MORTGAGE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

2/14/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - SA IMMOBILIERE LAFAYETTE

2/6/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - SA IMMOBILIERE LAFAYETTE

SUMMONS SERVED - FIFTH THIRD MORTGAGE

1/29/2020: SUMMONS SERVED - FIFTH THIRD MORTGAGE

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - FIFTH THRID MORTGAGE- ISSUED 12/20/2019

12/20/2019: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - FIFTH THRID MORTGAGE- ISSUED 12/20/2019

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - SA IMMOBILIERE LAFAYETTE- ISSUED 12/20/2019

12/20/2019: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - SA IMMOBILIERE LAFAYETTE- ISSUED 12/20/2019

NOTICE OF HEARING - AMENDED

3/30/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING - AMENDED

MOTION - APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

3/10/2020: MOTION - APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

NOTICE OF HEARING

3/10/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

AFFIDAVIT OF PROOF

3/2/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF PROOF

MOTION - FINAL JUDGMENT

3/2/2020: MOTION - FINAL JUDGMENT

SUMMONS SERVED - AMENDED AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - SA IMMOBILIERE LAFAYETTE A/K/A SA I LAFAYETTE

2/18/2020: SUMMONS SERVED - AMENDED AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - SA IMMOBILIERE LAFAYETTE A/K/A SA I LAFAYETTE

SUMMONS SERVED - EDWARD A VEOVICH

2/4/2020: SUMMONS SERVED - EDWARD A VEOVICH

SUMMONS SERVED - AMERICAN ESTATE AND TRUST FBO WILLIAM WEAVER IRA

1/29/2020: SUMMONS SERVED - AMERICAN ESTATE AND TRUST FBO WILLIAM WEAVER IRA

LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019174965)

12/20/2019: LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019174965)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISCHARGE/RELEASE LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2020051387)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • HearingTime:02:00 PM; Location:COURTROOM J; Description:MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - ALBERT J TISEO JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - RECORDED - QUIETING TITLE - Recorded (OR. / 2020048093)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING - AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Apr 8 2020 2:00PM JUDGE: RUHL, MARIA LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - ON REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Apr 8 2020 2:00PM JUDGE: RUHL, MARIA LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $440.00 RECEIPT #2019126698

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019174963)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - FIFTH THRID MORTGAGE- ISSUED 12/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - EDWARD A VEOVICH- ISSUED 12/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - AMERICAN ESTATE AND TRUST FBO WILLIAM WEAVE IRA- ISSUED 12/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - SA IMMOBILIERE LAFAYETTE- ISSUED 12/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019174965)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT REAL PROP $50,000 OR LESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EQUITY TRUST CO is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN ESTATE AND TRUST FBO WILLIAM WEAVER IRA is a litigant

Latest cases where Fifth Third Mortgage Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer POLICASTRO, DANIEL