This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 04/29/2022 at 18:16:14 (UTC).

EQUITY TRUST COMPANY AS CUSTODIAN FBO IRA ACCOUNT 200216004 VS IBERIABANK Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/28/2022 EQUITY TRUST COMPANY AS CUSTODIAN FBO IRA ACCOUNT 200216004 filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against IBERIABANK. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WALKER, STEPHEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 NC

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WALKER, STEPHEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EQUITY TRUST COMPANY AS CUSTODIAN FBO IRA ACCOUNT 200216004

Defendants

IBERIABANK

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

TRUIST BANK F/K/A BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GIBSON, JAMES

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

2/28/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE - OF VALUE

2/28/2022: NOTICE - OF VALUE

COMPLAINT FORECLS >$50,000-249,999.99

2/28/2022: COMPLAINT FORECLS >$50,000-249,999.99

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - TRUIST BANK FKA BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY

2/28/2022: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - TRUIST BANK FKA BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

2/28/2022: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - IBERIABANK

2/28/2022: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - IBERIABANK

PAYMENT $935.00 RECEIPT #2022018137

2/28/2022: PAYMENT $935.00 RECEIPT #2022018137

NOTICE OF NON COMPLIANCE CORRESPONDENCE

3/2/2022: NOTICE OF NON COMPLIANCE CORRESPONDENCE

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

3/3/2022: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

SUMMONS SERVED - IBERIABANK

3/18/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - IBERIABANK

SUMMONS SERVED - TRUIST BANK FKA BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY

3/18/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - TRUIST BANK FKA BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY

SUMMONS SERVED - STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

3/18/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - IBERIABANK A LOUISIANA STATE BANK

4/5/2022: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - IBERIABANK A LOUISIANA STATE BANK

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - TRUIST BANK FKA BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY A NORTH CAROLINA BANKING CORPORATION

4/5/2022: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - TRUIST BANK FKA BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY A NORTH CAROLINA BANKING CORPORATION

DEFAULT- IBERIABANK A LOUISIANA STATE BANK - TRUIST BANK FKA BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY A NORTH CAROLINA BANKING CORPORATION

4/6/2022: DEFAULT- IBERIABANK A LOUISIANA STATE BANK - TRUIST BANK FKA BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY A NORTH CAROLINA BANKING CORPORATION

MOTION - ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO SUBMIT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

4/19/2022: MOTION - ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO SUBMIT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO SUBMIT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT- IBERIABANK A LOUISIANA STATE BANK - TRUIST BANK FKA BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY A NORTH CAROLINA BANKING CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - TRUIST BANK FKA BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY A NORTH CAROLINA BANKING CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - IBERIABANK A LOUISIANA STATE BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - TRUIST BANK FKA BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - IBERIABANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF NON COMPLIANCE CORRESPONDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$935.00; Amount Paid:$935.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $935.00 RECEIPT #2022018137

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - IBERIABANK - ISSUED 3/7/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE - ISSUED 3/7/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - TRUIST BANK FKA BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY - ISSUED 3/7/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FORECLS >$50,000-249,999.99

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OF VALUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EQUITY TRUST CO is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE is a litigant

Latest cases where Truist Bank f/k/a Suntrust Bank d/b/a Lighstream is a litigant

Latest cases where IBERIABANK is a litigant