This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 12/19/2022 at 17:06:43 (UTC).

E A AN INSURED INDIVIDUAL BY AND THROUGH HIS/HER ASSIGNEE TAMPA BAY IMAGING LLC VS GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/05/2017 E A AN INSURED INDIVIDUAL BY AND THROUGH HIS/HER ASSIGNEE TAMPA BAY IMAGING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BOEHM, MARYANN OLSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************6 NC

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BOEHM, MARYANN OLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

E A AN INSURED INDIVIDUAL BY AND THROUGH HIS/HER ASSIGNEE TAMPA BAY IMAGING LLC

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRIEDMAN, PHILIP

Defendant Attorney

SALOMON, GIBELLE

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00

4/5/2017: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00

SUMMONS- PROPOSED- GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

4/5/2017: SUMMONS- PROPOSED- GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

4/5/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

PAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2017033545

4/5/2017: PAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2017033545

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/CANCELLATION OF SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION - DEFENDANT

5/1/2017: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/CANCELLATION OF SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION - DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL

5/1/2017: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL

PIP CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

5/2/2017: PIP CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

5/2/2017: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

5/22/2017: DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE

5/22/2017: NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE

PLAITNIFF'S MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

5/24/2017: PLAITNIFF'S MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

EXHIBIT A - CASE DOCKET

5/24/2017: EXHIBIT A - CASE DOCKET

MAIL RETURNED - E A AN INSURED INDIVIDUAL BY AND THROUGH HIS/HER ASSIGNE

6/5/2017: MAIL RETURNED - E A AN INSURED INDIVIDUAL BY AND THROUGH HIS/HER ASSIGNE

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

6/27/2017: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED - E A AN INSURED INDIVIDUAL BY AND THROUGH HIS/HER ASSIGNE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT A - CASE DOCKET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAITNIFF'S MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • HearingTime: 10:30 AM; Location: COURTROOM 5B; Description: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPIP CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE/CANCELLATION OF SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION - DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $65.00; Amount Paid: $65.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • FinancialFee Description: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00; Total Fee: $55.00; Amount Paid: $55.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2017033545

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 05/02/2017 AT 10:30 AM IN 5B , JDG: BOEHM, MARYANN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED- GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Philip Friedman