Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/06/2021 at 02:35:02 (UTC).

DUDKINA, ELINA Et Al VS BAYFRONT HEALTH PORT CHARLOTTE Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/30/2020 DUDKINA, ELINA filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against BAYFRONT HEALTH PORT CHARLOTTE. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WALKER, STEPHEN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 NC

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WALKER, STEPHEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DUDKINA, ELINA

KUSHNIR, VADIM

VADIM KUSHNIR AND ELINA DUDKINA ON BEHALF OF THEIR CHILD ADELE KUSHNIR

VADIM KUSHNIR AND ELINA DUDKINA ON BEHALF OF THEIR CHILD WILLIAM KUSHNIR

Defendants

COMMUNITY HEALTH SYSTEMS INC

ROBIN E OSBORN DO

BAYFRONT HMA PHYSICIAN MANAGEMENT LLC

BAYFRONT HEALTH PORT CHARLOTTE

SARASOTA MEMORIAL HEALTHCARE FOUNDATION INC

SARASOTA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL

ET AL

PORT CHARLOTTE HMA LLC

JOHNS HOPKINS ALL CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL INC

SALLY M SMITH MD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDERSON, GREGORY ANDREW

 

Court Documents

MAIL RETURNED - GREGORY ANDREW ANDERSON

10/26/2020: MAIL RETURNED - GREGORY ANDREW ANDERSON

PAYMENT $42.00 REFUND $358.00 RECEIPT #2020052365

6/30/2020: PAYMENT $42.00 REFUND $358.00 RECEIPT #2020052365

NOTICE - OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS EXTENSION

6/30/2020: NOTICE - OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS EXTENSION

PETITION FOR MEDICAL EXTENSION

6/29/2020: PETITION FOR MEDICAL EXTENSION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

6/29/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED - GREGORY ANDREW ANDERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$42.00; Amount Paid:$42.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $42.00 REFUND $358.00 RECEIPT #2020052365

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR MEDICAL EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bayfront HMA Physician Management, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Sarasota Memorial Hospital is a litigant

Latest cases where Community Health Systems, Inc. is a litigant