This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 00:33:54 (UTC).

DIXON, MARIAN VS CLEAR VIEW GLASS Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/25/2018 DIXON, MARIAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CLEAR VIEW GLASS. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MOSS, DANA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7 NC

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MOSS, DANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIXON, MARIAN

Defendants

HELM ENTERPRISES INC

CLEAR VIEW GLASS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

INVERSO, DARREN

 

Court Documents

ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019152912)

11/6/2019: ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019152912)

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD - LOP ORDER FOR DISMISSAL

11/5/2019: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD - LOP ORDER FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF HEARING FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION

8/28/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION - HEARING

10/8/2018: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION - HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

9/19/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - HELM ENTERPRISES INC DBA CLEAR VIEW GLASS

9/18/2018: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - HELM ENTERPRISES INC DBA CLEAR VIEW GLASS

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME: HELM ENTERPRISES INC

9/11/2018: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME: HELM ENTERPRISES INC

SUMMONS SERVED - HELM ENTERPRISES INC

8/24/2018: SUMMONS SERVED - HELM ENTERPRISES INC

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2018075786

7/25/2018: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2018075786

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - HELM ENTERPRISES INC - ISSUED 07/25/2018

7/25/2018: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - HELM ENTERPRISES INC - ISSUED 07/25/2018

COMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

7/25/2018: COMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019152912)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • HearingTime:10:45 AM; Location:COURTROOM 2B; Description:LACK OF PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD - LOP ORDER FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketLACK OF PROSECUTION SET FOR 11/05/2019 AT 10:45 AM IN 2B , JDG: MOSS, DANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • HearingTime:03:00 PM; Location:COURTROOM 2B; Description:MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION - HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • HearingTime:11:30 AM; Location:COURTROOM 2A; Description:MOTIONS ;Court Result:CANCELLED BY JACS INTERFACE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • DocketACTION: DEFAULT NOT ENTERED AS PLEADINGS FILED 9/11/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Oct 9 2018 3:00PM JUDGE: GOLDMAN, JUDITH M LOCATION: 2B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • Docket*** CANCELLED - COURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Oct 5 2018 11:30AM JUDGE: GOLDMAN, JUDITH M LOCATION: 2A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Oct 5 2018 11:30AM JUDGE: GOLDMAN, JUDITH M LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - HELM ENTERPRISES INC DBA CLEAR VIEW GLASS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME: HELM ENTERPRISES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - HELM ENTERPRISES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$310.00; Amount Paid:$310.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2018075786

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - HELM ENTERPRISES INC - ISSUED 07/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less