This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 03/15/2023 at 00:40:19 (UTC).

DIXON, KENNETH Et Al VS COWHIG, FRANZ

Case Summary

On 12/27/2022 DIXON, KENNETH filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against COWHIG, FRANZ. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WALKER, STEPHEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4 NC

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WALKER, STEPHEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DIXON, KENNETH

DIXON, SHANNON

Defendant

COWHIG, FRANZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREGG MARTIN HOROWITZ

Defendant Attorney

EISEMANN, DEREK

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/23/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - FRANZ COWHIG

12/23/2022: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - FRANZ COWHIG

NOTICE - CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PROTOCOLS FOR CIRCUIT CIVIL CASES

12/23/2022: NOTICE - CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PROTOCOLS FOR CIRCUIT CIVIL CASES

COMPLAINT

12/23/2022: COMPLAINT

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022113334

12/27/2022: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022113334

ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

1/6/2023: ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

SUMMONS SERVED - FRANZ COWHIG

1/27/2023: SUMMONS SERVED - FRANZ COWHIG

ANSWER - AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - FRANZ COWHIG

2/8/2023: ANSWER - AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - FRANZ COWHIG

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

2/8/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION

2/8/2023: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - DEFENDANT'S FIRST

2/8/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - DEFENDANT'S FIRST

CERTIFICATE OF NO OBJECTION

2/24/2023: CERTIFICATE OF NO OBJECTION

SUBPOENA RETURNED - SERVED - LIZ ARME

3/2/2023: SUBPOENA RETURNED - SERVED - LIZ ARME

SUBPOENA RETURNED - BERLIN PATTEN EBLING PLLC

3/2/2023: SUBPOENA RETURNED - BERLIN PATTEN EBLING PLLC

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2023
  • HearingTime: 01:30 PM; Location: COURTROOM 7C; Description: CASE MANAGEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBPOENA RETURNED - BERLIN PATTEN EBLING PLLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBPOENA RETURNED - SERVED - LIZ ARME

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF NO OBJECTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - DEFENDANT'S FIRST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER - AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - FRANZ COWHIG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - FRANZ COWHIG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 05/01/2023 AT 1:30 PM IN 7C , JDG: WALKER, STEPHEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $410.00; Amount Paid: $410.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT; Total Fee: $400.00; Amount Paid: $400.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022113334

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PROTOCOLS FOR CIRCUIT CIVIL CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - FRANZ COWHIG - ISSUED 12/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less