This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 10/19/2020 at 18:34:50 (UTC).

DISSINGTON, LAURA J VS AXIS PHYSICAL THERAPY INC

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 DISSINGTON, LAURA J filed an Other lawsuit against AXIS PHYSICAL THERAPY INC. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARROLL, HUNTER W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 NC

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARROLL, HUNTER W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISSINGTON, LAURA J

Defendants

AXIS PHYSICAL THERAPY INC

TIM LOY PHYSICAL THERAPY PLLC D/B/A AXIS PHYSICAL THERAPY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANNAN, BRYAN

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2020079884

10/8/2020: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2020079884

EXHIBIT - A

10/8/2020: EXHIBIT - A

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

10/8/2020: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - AS TO AMENDED PETITION - TIM LOY PHYSICAL THERAPY PLLC D/B/A AXIS PHYSICAL THERAPY- ISSUED 10/08/2020

10/8/2020: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - AS TO AMENDED PETITION - TIM LOY PHYSICAL THERAPY PLLC D/B/A AXIS PHYSICAL THERAPY- ISSUED 10/08/2020

PETITION - AMENDED - FOR EQUITABLE DISTRIBUTION OF PERSONAL INJURY PROCEEDS

10/8/2020: PETITION - AMENDED - FOR EQUITABLE DISTRIBUTION OF PERSONAL INJURY PROCEEDS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

10/2/2020: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2020077081

9/30/2020: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2020077081

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - AXIS PHYSICAL THERAPY INC- ISSUED 10/01/2020

9/30/2020: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - AXIS PHYSICAL THERAPY INC- ISSUED 10/01/2020

PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2020075791

9/25/2020: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2020075791

PETITION

9/25/2020: PETITION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/25/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2020079884

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT - A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - AS TO AMENDED PETITION - TIM LOY PHYSICAL THERAPY PLLC D/B/A AXIS PHYSICAL THERAPY- ISSUED 10/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION - AMENDED - FOR EQUITABLE DISTRIBUTION OF PERSONAL INJURY PROCEEDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2020077081

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - AXIS PHYSICAL THERAPY INC- ISSUED 10/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$420.00; Amount Paid:$420.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2020075791

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less