This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/10/2021 at 19:48:03 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS SILVERBERG, JAYNE

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SILVERBERG, JAYNE. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7 NC

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

SILVERBERG, JAYNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DALEY, SARAH

 

Court Documents

CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM RAUSCH, STURM, ISRAEL ET AL

2/27/2018: CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM RAUSCH, STURM, ISRAEL ET AL

JUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018025571)

2/27/2018: JUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018025571)

NOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT OF ACCOUNT - MARKED AS EXHIBIT A

2/14/2018: NOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT OF ACCOUNT - MARKED AS EXHIBIT A

AFFIDAVIT - COURT COSTS

2/14/2018: AFFIDAVIT - COURT COSTS

DEFAULT - JAYNE SILVERBERG

11/14/2017: DEFAULT - JAYNE SILVERBERG

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - JAYNE SILVERBERG

11/10/2017: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - JAYNE SILVERBERG

SUMMONS SERVED - JAYNE SILVERBERG

9/21/2017: SUMMONS SERVED - JAYNE SILVERBERG

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

9/12/2017: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

COMPLAINT - COUNTY

9/12/2017: COMPLAINT - COUNTY

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

2/27/2018: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

2/27/2018: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

INFORMATION SHEET

2/14/2018: INFORMATION SHEET

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

2/14/2018: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

2/14/2018: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

AFFIDAVIT - NON MILITARY

11/10/2017: AFFIDAVIT - NON MILITARY

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017087198

9/14/2017: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017087198

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- JAYNE SILVERBERG - ISSUED 09/14/2017

9/12/2017: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- JAYNE SILVERBERG - ISSUED 09/14/2017

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/12/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM RAUSCH, STURM, ISRAEL ET AL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018025571)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT OF ACCOUNT - MARKED AS EXHIBIT A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - COURT COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT - JAYNE SILVERBERG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - NON MILITARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - JAYNE SILVERBERG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - JAYNE SILVERBERG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$310.00; Amount Paid:$310.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017087198

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- JAYNE SILVERBERG - ISSUED 09/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less