This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 03/26/2023 at 17:36:31 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS MILO, DIANA L

Case Summary

On 03/13/2023 DISCOVER BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MILO, DIANA L. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 NC

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

MILO, DIANA L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CLARK, DALTON

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

3/13/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500

3/13/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500

SUMMONS- PROPOSED

3/13/2023: SUMMONS- PROPOSED

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023023306

3/13/2023: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023023306

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- DIANA L MILO

3/15/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- DIANA L MILO

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2023
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 2; Description: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- DIANA L MILO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 04/04/2023 AT 9:00 AM IN 2 , JDG: COUNTY CIVIL C AND D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $310.00; Amount Paid: $310.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500; Total Fee: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023023306

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less