This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/16/2021 at 02:13:00 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS LAWHUN, BARBARA

Case Summary

On 07/11/2018 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LAWHUN, BARBARA. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************6 SC

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

LAWHUN, BARBARA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HEBB, LEONARD

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

4/8/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE - TO INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANT(S) PURSUANT TO FL STATUE 77.041(1)(2)

4/8/2019: NOTICE - TO INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANT(S) PURSUANT TO FL STATUE 77.041(1)(2)

PAYMENT $85.00 RECEIPT #2019028193

3/18/2019: PAYMENT $85.00 RECEIPT #2019028193

WRIT PROPOSED

3/18/2019: WRIT PROPOSED

MOTION - FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

11/21/2018: MOTION - FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

DEFAULT - BARBARA LAWHUN

9/11/2018: DEFAULT - BARBARA LAWHUN

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - BARBARA LAWHUN

9/7/2018: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - BARBARA LAWHUN

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-BARBARA LAWHUN - ISSUED 07/11/2018

7/11/2018: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-BARBARA LAWHUN - ISSUED 07/11/2018

CIVIL COVER SHEET

7/11/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

5/13/2019: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

ANSWER OF GARNISHEE - SUNTRUST BANK

4/15/2019: ANSWER OF GARNISHEE - SUNTRUST BANK

RESPONSE - PLAINTIFF'S TO DEFENDANT'S AFFIDAVIT OF EXEMPTION

4/10/2019: RESPONSE - PLAINTIFF'S TO DEFENDANT'S AFFIDAVIT OF EXEMPTION

WRIT RETURNED - GARNISHMENT - SUNTRUST BANK

4/8/2019: WRIT RETURNED - GARNISHMENT - SUNTRUST BANK

CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

12/10/2018: CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018160034)

12/10/2018: JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018160034)

AFFIDAVIT - NON MILITARY

9/7/2018: AFFIDAVIT - NON MILITARY

CERTIFICATE OF ATTORNEY

9/7/2018: CERTIFICATE OF ATTORNEY

COMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

7/11/2018: COMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2019
  • HearingTime:01:00 PM; Location:COURTROOM H; Description:MOTIONS ;Court Result:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF GARNISHEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER OF GARNISHEE - SUNTRUST BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE - PLAINTIFF'S TO DEFENDANT'S AFFIDAVIT OF EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - TO INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANT(S) PURSUANT TO FL STATUE 77.041(1)(2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: May 13 2019 1:00PM JUDGE: QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N. LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT RETURNED - GARNISHMENT - SUNTRUST BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketACTION: FWD CLMEXE TO JA FOR JUDGE REVIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - BARBARA LAWHUN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - NON MILITARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - BARBARA LAWHUN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$395.00; Amount Paid:$395.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2018070720

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-BARBARA LAWHUN - ISSUED 07/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less