This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/27/2023 at 18:46:59 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS KOLBE, DAWN A

Case Summary

On 01/03/2023 DISCOVER BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KOLBE, DAWN A. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GALEN, PHYLLIS R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GALEN, PHYLLIS R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

KOLBE, DAWN A

Sarasota, FL 34231

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ZOGG, ERIK

CLARK, DALTON

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/31/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500

12/31/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500

SUMMONS- PROPOSED

12/31/2022: SUMMONS- PROPOSED

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - DAWN A KOLBE

1/3/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - DAWN A KOLBE

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023000523

1/3/2023: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023000523

SUMMONS SERVED - DAWN A KOLBE

1/12/2023: SUMMONS SERVED - DAWN A KOLBE

SUMMONS SERVED - DAWN A KOLBE

1/12/2023: SUMMONS SERVED - DAWN A KOLBE

APPEARANCE RECORD DEFAULT

1/18/2023: APPEARANCE RECORD DEFAULT

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE RECORD DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 2; Description: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - DAWN A KOLBE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - DAWN A KOLBE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $310.00; Amount Paid: $310.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500; Total Fee: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023000523

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - DAWN A KOLBE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 01/17/2023 AT 9:00 AM IN 2 , JDG: GALEN, PHYLLIS R

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less